Address
c/o Urs Fankhauser
Aspenweg 11
3818 Grindelwald
Reports for Wassergenossenschaft Itramen-Wärgistal
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Wassergenossenschaft Itramen-Wärgistal
- Wassergenossenschaft Itramen-Wärgistal is active in the industry «Water and sewage utilities» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Grindelwald.
- Wassergenossenschaft Itramen-Wärgistal was founded on 25.05.1973.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 08.02.2024.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register BE under the UID CHE-102.267.106.
Management (5)
newest members of the administration
Rudolf Jossi,
Hans-Martin Bleuer,
Aron Knecht,
Urs Fankhauser,
Adolf Kaufmann
newest authorized signatories
Rudolf Jossi,
Hans-Martin Bleuer,
Aron Knecht,
Urs Fankhauser,
Adolf Kaufmann
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.05.1973
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Grindelwald
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.5.002.918-3
UID/VAT
CHE-102.267.106
Sector
Water and sewage utilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Genossenschaft bezweckt, ihre Mitglieder in gemeinsamer Selbsthilfe und die weitere Bevölkerung sowie Landwirtschafts-, Gewerbe-, Industrie- und Dienstleistungsbetriebe im Rahmen der zur Verfügung stehenden Menge im Gebiet Itramen-Wärgistal mit Trink- und Brauchwasser zu versorgen. Sie erstellt und unterhält ihre Leitungen und die Hydranten mit den zugehörigen Anlagen für die Beschaffung, ev. Aufbereitung, Förderung und Speicherung des Wassers.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Lehmann + Bacher Treuhand AG | Meiringen | 12.11.2009 | 05.04.2017 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Wasserversorgungsgenossenschaft Itramen-Wärgistal
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Wassergenossenschaft Itramen-Wärgistal
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005955915, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Wassergenossenschaft Itramen-Wärgistal, in Grindelwald, CHE-102.267.106, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 116 vom 18.06.2021, Publ. 1005221503).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Boss, Albert, von Grindelwald, in Grindelwald, Mitglied und Kassier der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Jossi, Rudolf, von Grindelwald, in Grindelwald, Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bleuer, Hans Martin, von Grindelwald, in Grindelwald, Mitglied und Kassier der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Jossi, Rudolf, genannt Ruedi, von Grindelwald, in Grindelwald, Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005221503, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Wassergenossenschaft Itramen-Wärgistal, in Grindelwald, CHE-102.267.106, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 68 vom 06.04.2017, Publ. 3449591).
Domizil neu:
c/o Urs Fankhauser, Aspenweg 11, 3818 Grindelwald.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wyss, Bruno, von Jegenstorf, in Grindelwald, Mitglied/Brunnenmeister, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Meyer, Peter, von Grindelwald, in Grindelwald, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fankhauser, Urs, von Trub, in Grindelwald, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Jossi, Rudolf, von Grindelwald, in Grindelwald, Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Kaufmann, Adolf, von Grindelwald, in Grindelwald, Mitglied und Sekretär der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Knecht, Aron, von Bäretswil, in Grindelwald, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Brunnenmeister, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3449591, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Wassergenossenschaft Itramen-Wärgistal, in Grindelwald, CHE-102.267.106, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 7 vom 12.01.2016, Publ. 2589149). Gemäss Erklärung vom 13.03.2017 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lehmann + Bacher Treuhand AG, in Meiringen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Boss, Albert, von Grindelwald, in Grindelwald, Mitglied und Kassier der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied und Kassier der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.