Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Address
c/o BDS Consulting AG
Vordergasse 3
8200 Schaffhausen
Reports for VT Finance AG
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.11.1995
Deletion from the commercial register
04.05.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Schaffhausen
Commercial Registry Office
SH
Commercial register number
CH-290.3.001.378-9
UID/VAT
CHE-103.445.652
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Halten und Verwalten von Beteiligungen an Unternehmen sowie von Finanzanlagen aller Art im In- und Ausland. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen und finanziellen Geschäfte durchführen, die ihrem Zweck förderlich sind, einschliesslich des Verkaufs aller oder eines Teils ihrer Beteiligungen und Anlagen.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Bern | 08.10.2009 | 03.05.2010 | |
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | 19.05.2009 | 07.10.2009 | |
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zug | <2004 | 18.05.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- VT Finance Ltd
- VT Finance SA
- BB Medtech AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: VT Finance AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5616762, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
VT Finance AG, in Schaffhausen, CH-290.3.001.378-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 211 vom 30.10.2009, S. 14, Publ. 5318976). Aktiven und Fremdkapital gehen infolge Fusion auf die VT Investment (Zürich) AG (CH-020.3.034.889-8), in Zürich, über. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: 5318976, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
VT Finance AG, in Schaffhausen, CH-290.3.001.378-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 195 vom 08.10.2009, S. 14, Publ. 5282860).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dubois, Noël, von Travers, in Wettingen, Geschäftsführer, mit Unterschrift zu zweien;
Burkart, Mario, von Widnau, in Uster, mit Unterschrift zu zweien;
Vögeli, Dr. Eduard, von Fehraltorf, in Fehraltorf, mit Unterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 5282860, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
BB Medtech AG, in Schaffhausen, CH-290.3.001.378-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 95 vom 19.05.2009, S. 16, Publ. 5025454).
Statutenänderung:
26.08.2009.
Firma neu:
VT Finance AG.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(VT Finance SA) (VT Finance Ltd).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schmucki, Pascal, von Littau, in Zürich, mit Unterschrift zu zweien;
Reim, Dr. Wolfgang, von Deutschland, in Campow (DE), Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Unterschrift zu zweien;
von Prondzynski, Heinz genannt Heino, von Deutschland, in Einsiedeln, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Unterschrift zu zweien;
Blum, Stefan, von Allschwil, in Schmerikon, mit Unterschrift zu zweien;
Hutter, Michael, von Baar, in Baar, mit Unterschrift zu zweien;
Rossi, Laura, von Poschiavo, in Küsnacht ZH, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Unterschrift zu zweien;
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG (CH-020.3.020.876-5), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ernst & Young AG (CH-035.9.020.344-5), in Bern, Revisionsstelle;
Sieg Castagnola, Martin, von Zürich, in Zollikon, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Unterschrift zu zweien;
Studer, Roger, von Zürich, in Herrliberg, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Unterschrift zu zweien;
Temperli, Walter, von Hirzel, in Oberweiningen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Unterschrift zu zweien.