Address
Voia Principala 6
7084 Brienz/Brinzauls GR
Reports for Viehversicherungsgenossenschaft Albula
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Viehversicherungsgenossenschaft Albula
- Viehversicherungsgenossenschaft Albula has its legal headquarters in Brienz/Brinzauls GR and is active. It is a Cooperative and active in the industry «Operation of an insurance company».
- The organization was founded on 22.12.2000.
- On the 13.05.2022 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The organization's UID is CHE-101.628.029.
Management (6)
newest members of the administration
Rafael Demarmels,
Nicole Heinrich,
Jost Walter Niederberger,
Risch Tscharner,
David Sigron
newest authorized signatories
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.12.2000
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Albula/Alvra
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.5.000.771-2
UID/VAT
CHE-101.628.029
Sector
Operation of an insurance company
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Genossenschaft bezweckt, ihre Mitglieder gegen den Schaden gemäss den Versicherungsbedingungen zu versichern, welcher dadurch entsteht, dass versicherte Tiere infolge von Krankheit, Unfall oder eines Elementarereignisses eingehen oder geschlachtet werden müssen. Sie führt eine Versicherung für Rindvieh und kann auch eine Versicherung für Kleinvieh und eine Zusatzversicherung für Rindvieh anbieten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Viehversicherungsgenossenschaft Albula
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005473317, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Viehversicherungsgenossenschaft Albula, in Albula/Alvra, CHE-101.628.029, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 108 vom 06.06.2019, Publ. 1004646040).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Falett, Alfred , genannt Fredo, von Bergün Filisur, in Bergün Filisur, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Demarmels, Rafael, von Surses, in Surses, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Heinrich, Nicole, von Arosa, in Bergün Filisur, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1004646040, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Viehversicherungsgenossenschaft Albula, in Albula/Alvra, CHE-101.628.029, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 102 vom 30.05.2018, Publ. 4258449).
Domizil neu:
Voia Principala 6, 7084 Brienz/Brinzauls GR.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bonifazi, Leo, von Mon, in Mon, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, Aktuar, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Jegher, Giatgen, von Mulegns, in Mulegns, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Niederberger, Jost Walter, von Wolfenschiessen, in Albula/Alvra, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Tscharner, Risch, von Domleschg, in Albula/Alvra, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 4258449, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Viehversicherungsgenossenschaft Albula, in Albula/Alvra, CHE-101.628.029, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 245 vom 16.12.2016, Publ. 3227865).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schaniel, Gion-Franzestg, von Tinizong-Rona, in Tinizong-Rona, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sigron, David, von Vaz/Obervaz, in Vaz/Obervaz, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Falett, Alfred , genannt Fredo, von Bergün Filisur, in Bergün Filisur, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Falett, Fredo, von Bergün/Bravuogn, in Bergün/Bravuogn, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Demarmels, Rafael, von Surses, in Surses, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.