Reports for VGA-Voiles Gautier Associés SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout VGA-Voiles Gautier Associés SA
- VGA-Voiles Gautier Associés SA is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Morges. VGA-Voiles Gautier Associés SA belongs to the industry «Textile production (without clothing)» and is currently active.
- There is one active person registered in the management.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 28.07.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-102.121.000.
- The address is identical with 6 other active companies. These include: Deux Soeurs Sàrl, Omnisens S.A., Scub H2o Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.03.2001
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Morges
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.023.857-9
UID/VAT
CHE-102.121.000
Sector
Textile production (without clothing)
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
exploitation d'une voilerie et d'un atelier de façon de tissus en tout genre; commerce de voiles, de matériaux en tissus et tout produit ayant un rapport avec la voile (accastillage, vêtements, etc.).
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Tucker | Lonay | 04.11.2005 | 24.06.2009 | |
Fidacor Fiduciaire et Gérance Sàrl | Morges | <2004 | 03.11.2005 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: VGA-Voiles Gautier Associés SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005806741, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
VGA-Voiles Gautier Associés SA, à Morges, CHE-102.121.000 (FOSC du 27.03.2017, p. 0/3427639). Péclard Christophe n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Kunz Thierry, de Trub, à Lausanne, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: 3427639, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
VGA-Voiles Gautier Associés SA, à Morges, CHE-102.121.000 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). Vaucher Michel n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Péclard Christophe, qui n'est plus vice-président et secrétaire, reste seul administrateur et signe désormais individuellement.
Publication number: 5091598, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
VGA-Voiles Gautier Associés SA, à Morges, CH-550-1023857-9, exploitation d'une voilerie et d'un atelier de façon de tissus en tout genre (FOSC du 06.08.2007, p. 16/4055026). Statuts modifiés le 8 juin 2009.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par lettre recommandée envoyée à chacun des actionnaires inscrits au registre des actions, à la dernière adressee qu'il aura communiquée à la société. Selon déclaration du conseil d'administration du 8 juin 2009, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte. Fiduciaire Tucker n'est plus organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.