Reports for VetSun SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout VetSun SA
- VetSun SA has its legal headquarters in Attalens, is active and operates in the sector «Electrical power production and utilities».
- The management has 2 active persons registered.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 20.03.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company's UID is CHE-380.408.817.
- Sunstreet SA, UNITI SA are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.07.2022
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Attalens
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.581.042-0
UID/VAT
CHE-380.408.817
Sector
Electrical power production and utilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but la production et la vente d'énergie renouvelable, l'établissement de contrats de distribution et la réalisation de projets de distribution d'énergie. La société peut également: exercer toute activité financière, commerciale ou industrielle, mobilière ou immobilière, en rapport direct ou indirect avec son but; créer des succursales ou des filiales en Suisse ou à l'étranger; participer à toutes entreprises ayant un rapport direct ou indirect avec son but; accorder des prêts ou des garanties à des actionnaires ou des tiers, si cela favorise ses intérêts.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: VetSun SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005990173, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
VetSun SA, à Romont (FR), CHE-380.408.817 (FOSC du 13.11.2023, p. 0/1005883102). Siège transféré à Attalens.
Nouvelle adresse:
Route de Granges 50, 1616 Attalens.
Communication aux actionnaires:
par écrit (courrier postal ou courrier électronique). Statuts modifiés le 06.02.2024.
Publication number: HR02-1005883102, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
VetSun SA, à Romont (FR), CHE-380.408.817 (FOSC du 21.07.2022, p. 0/1005526041).
Personne inscrite radiée:
Hanbali Masri Rafic, administrateur, signature individuelle.
Nouvelles personnes inscrites:
Bonvin Jacques, de Arbaz, à Attalens, administrateur, président, signature collective à deux;
Affolter Pascal William Jacques, de Grenchen, à Penthalaz, administrateur, signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR01-1005526041, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
VetSun SA, à Romont (FR), Route de la Maillarde 5, c/o Kromatix SA, 1680 Romont FR, CHE-380.408.817. Nouvelle société anonyme. Statuts du 08.06.2022.
But:
la société a pour but la production et la vente d'énergie renouvelable, l'établissement de contrats de distribution et la réalisation de projets de distribution d'énergie.
La société peut également:
exercer toute activité financière, commerciale ou industrielle, mobilière ou immobilière, en rapport direct ou indirect avec son but;
créer des succursales ou des filiales en Suisse ou à l'étranger;
participer à toutes entreprises ayant un rapport direct ou indirect avec son but;
accorder des prêts ou des garanties à des actionnaires ou des tiers, si cela favorise ses intérêts.
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000, libéré à concurrence de CHF 50'000, divisé en 100'000 actions de CHF 1, nominatives. Restriction de transmissibilité des actions selon statuts.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communication aux actionnaires:
FOSC.
Personne inscrite:
Hanbali Masri Rafic, de France, à Morges, administrateur, signature individuelle. Selon déclaration du 08.06.2022, la société n'est pas soumise à un contrôle ordinaire et renonce à un contrôle restreint.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.