Reports for Vertis Aviation AG in Liquidation
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Vertis Aviation AG in Liquidation
- Vertis Aviation AG in Liquidation in Zug is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Other transportation services». Vertis Aviation AG in Liquidation is in liquidation.
- The company was founded on 12.10.2010 and has one person in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 25.10.2023.
- The company's UID is CHE-116.077.859.
- Next to the company Vertis Aviation AG in Liquidation there are 20 other active companies with an identical address. These include: 88K AG, Aeskulap Praxis - Integrative Medizin AG, Aeskulap Praxis Dr. med. Bernd Orzessek.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.10.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zug
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.035.006-5
UID/VAT
CHE-116.077.859
Sector
Other transportation services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringung sämtlicher Aufgaben und Dienstleistungen im Zusammenhang mit der Vercharterung von Luftfahrzeugen in der Schweiz und im Ausland sowie Handel mit und Vermittlung von Flugzeugen und Zubehör auf eigene Rechnung und für Dritte. Operation und Bewirtschaftung von Luftfahrzeugen und Erbringung sämtlicher Aufgaben und Leistungen, die im Zusammenhang mit der Operation und dem Betrieb von Luftfahrzeugen stehen; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treucontrol AG | Egg | 18.10.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Vertis Aviation SA en liquidation
- Vertis Aviation Ltd in liquidation
- Vertis Aviation SA
- Vertis Aviation AG
- Vertis Aviation Ltd
- Vertis AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Vertis Aviation AG in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: LS01-0000045253, Commercial Registry Office Zug
Rubrik: Liquidationsschuldenrufe Unterrubrik: Liquidationsschuldenruf einer Aktiengesellschaft Publikationsdatum: SHAB 25.10.2023 Öffentlich einsehbar bis: 25.10.2028 Meldungsnummer: Liquidationsschuldenruf Vertis Aviation AG in Liquidation Organisation in Auflösung: Vertis Aviation AG in Liquidation CHE-116.077.859 Baarerstrasse 88
Kontaktstelle: Hans-Rudolf Wild, Felix Kappeler, Nina Frei & Manuel Inderbitzin, Dammstrasse 19,
Publication number: HR02-1005858972, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Vertis Aviation AG, in Zug, CHE-116.077.859, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 142 vom 25.07.2023, Publ. 1005803348).
Firma neu:
Vertis Aviation AG in Liquidation.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(Vertis Aviation SA en liquidation) (Vertis Aviation Ltd in liquidation).
Aktien neu:
10'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 10.00 [bisher: 10'000 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 10.00].
Vinkulierung neu:
Die statutarische Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist von Gesetzes wegen aufgehoben. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 29.09.2023 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Emmenis, Jeffrey Dean, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Baar, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Emmenis, Janine, von Baar, in Baar, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift, Liquidatorin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: britische Staatsangehörige, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.