Reports for Verein PlantoB
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Verein PlantoB
- Verein PlantoB with its legal headquarters in Reinach AG is active. Verein PlantoB operates in the sector «Other social services».
- Verein PlantoB was founded on 10.02.2014.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 18.09.2020. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The organization's UID is CHE-322.546.929.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.02.2014
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Reinach (AG)
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.6.037.865-7
UID/VAT
CHE-322.546.929
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Der Verein bezweckt die Förderung und die Beschäftigung von Erwachsenen Personen in Form einer Tagesstruktur, dessen Zugang zum 1. Arbeitsmarkt aus gesundheitlichen oder sozialen Gründen verwehrt ist. Der Verein führt dazu Projekte im Bereich Kiosk, Gastronomie, Onlinehandel und externen Aufträgen und Handel mit Waren aller Art. Er fördert den gesellschaftlichen Zusammenhalt zwischen Klientel und Gesellschaft mittels Vereinsanlässen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Verein PlantoB
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004981653, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Verein PlantoB, in Menziken, CHE-322.546.929, Verein (SHAB Nr. 29 vom 12.02.2015, S.0, Publ. 1986883).
Statutenänderung:
31.07.2020.
Sitz neu:
Reinach (AG).
Domizil neu:
Bahnhofstrasse 9, 5734 Reinach AG.
Zweck neu:
Der Verein bezweckt die Förderung und die Beschäftigung von Erwachsenen Personen in Form einer Tagesstruktur, dessen Zugang zum 1. Arbeitsmarkt aus gesundheitlichen oder sozialen Gründen verwehrt ist. Der Verein führt dazu Projekte im Bereich Kiosk, Gastronomie, Onlinehandel und externen Aufträgen und Handel mit Waren aller Art. Er fördert den gesellschaftlichen Zusammenhalt zwischen Klientel und Gesellschaft mittels Vereinsanlässen.
Mittel neu:
Mittel: Beiträge der öffentlichen Hand für Betreuungsleistungen, Einnahmen aus Projekten, Mitgliederbeiträge und Spenden. [bisher: Mittel: Beiträge der öffentlichen Hand, Gönnerbeiträge und Spenden.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Buda, Salvatore, von Lenzburg, in Beinwil am See, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Bürgi, Marc, von Erlinsbach AG, in Gränichen, Mitglied des Vorstandes, Kassier, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 1986883, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Verein PlantoB, in Menziken, CHE-322.546.929, Verein (SHAB Nr. 125 vom 02.07.2014, Publ. 1588361).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Räss, Christian, von Trachselwald, in Suhr, Vizepräsident des Vorstandes und Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meier, Claudia, von Kriens, Hergiswil bei Willisau und Luzern, in Menziken, Vizepräsidentin des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1588361, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Verein PlantoB, in Menziken, CHE-322.546.929, Verein (SHAB Nr. 30 vom 13.02.2014, Publ. 1344745).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meier, Claudia, von Kriens, in Menziken, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.