Reports for Verein Chindernetz Kanton Bern
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Verein Chindernetz Kanton Bern
- Verein Chindernetz Kanton Bern is currently active and the industry «Other social services». The legal headquarters are in Bern.
- The organization was founded on 06.07.2020.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 09.08.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the organization Verein Chindernetz Kanton Bern is registered under the UID CHE-229.307.489.
Management (8)
newest members of the committee
Oliver Gurtner,
Karin Fisli,
Reto Künzi,
Susanne Muralt,
Christian Hohnbaum
newest authorized signatories
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.07.2020
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.6.081.883-8
UID/VAT
CHE-229.307.489
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Der Verein bezweckt die Förderung und Unterstützung von Kindern, Jugendlichen und Familien im Kanton Bern sowie die Organisation von Angeboten für die genannten Zielgruppen. Er beschränkt seine Tätigkeit vorwiegend auf sein geographisches Einzugsgebiet und setzt dabei auf eine regionale Verankerung. Projektbezogene Programme kann er aber anderen Kantonen und Regionen zugänglich machen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
von Graffenried AG Treuhand | Bern | 09.07.2020 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Verein Chindernetz Kanton Bern
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006103251, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Verein Chindernetz Kanton Bern, in Bern, CHE-229.307.489, Verein (SHAB Nr. 132 vom 11.07.2023, Publ. 1005792117).
Statutenänderung:
15.06.2023. 13.06.2024. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Touré, Arlette, von Diessbach bei Büren, in Bern, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gurtner, Oliver, von Bern, in Bern, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005792117, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Verein Chindernetz Kanton Bern, in Bern, CHE-229.307.489, Verein (SHAB Nr. 140 vom 21.07.2022, Publ. 1005525841).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gottret, Anna, von Veyrier, in Spiegel b. Bern (Köniz), Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005525841, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Verein Chindernetz Kanton Bern, in Bern, CHE-229.307.489, Verein (SHAB Nr. 182 vom 20.09.2021, Publ. 1005294378).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bauer, Tanja, von Binn, in Wabern (Köniz), Co-Präsidentin des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Muralt, Susanne, von Trub, in Ostermundigen, Co-Präsidentin des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Fisli, Karin, von Bolligen, in Meikirch, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Künzi, Reto, von Trub, in Zollikofen, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.