Address
c/o CRF Conseil, Révision et Fiscalité SA
Rue des Moulins 13
2800 Delémont
Reports for VELT LOGISTICS Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout VELT LOGISTICS Sàrl
- VELT LOGISTICS Sàrl has its legal headquarters in Delémont and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «Other transportation services».
- The management of the company VELT LOGISTICS Sàrl consists of 2 persons.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 22.12.2021. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company VELT LOGISTICS Sàrl is registered under the UID CHE-207.037.749.
- Next to the company VELT LOGISTICS Sàrl there are 19 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Asquare Finance International Sàrl, Cabinet Fueg SA, CIPR SWISS Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.09.2021
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Delémont
Commercial Registry Office
JU
Commercial register number
CH-670.4.008.952-4
UID/VAT
CHE-207.037.749
Sector
Other transportation services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Tous types de transports nationaux et internationaux, ainsi que la location de véhicules en tous genres. A cet effet, la société peut exercer toute activité financière, commerciale ou industrielle, mobilière ou immobilière, en rapport direct ou indirect avec son but; créer des succursales ou des filiales en Suisse et à l'étranger; participer à toutes entreprises ayant un rapport direct ou indirect avec son but; accorder des prêts ou des garanties à des associés ou des tiers, si cela favorise ses intérêts.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: VELT LOGISTICS Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005364890, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
VELT LOGISTICS Sàrl, à Delémont, CHE-207.037.749, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 188 du 28.09.2021, Publ. 1005300717).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Kordic, Nenad, ressortissant français, à Huningue (FR), associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 200 parts sociales de CHF 100.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Kordic, Luka, ressortissant français, à Huningue (FR), associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 200 parts sociales de CHF 100.00.
Publication number: HR01-1005300717, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
VELT LOGISTICS Sàrl, à Delémont, CHE-207.037.749, c/o CRF Conseil, Révision et Fiscalité SA, Rue des Moulins 13, 2800 Delémont, société à responsabilité limitée (Nouvelle inscription).
Date des statuts:
22.09.2021.
But:
Tous types de transports nationaux et internationaux, ainsi que la location de véhicules en tous genres. A cet effet, la société peut exercer toute activité financière, commerciale ou industrielle, mobilière ou immobilière, en rapport direct ou indirect avec son but;
créer des succursales ou des filiales en Suisse et à l'étranger;
participer à toutes entreprises ayant un rapport direct ou indirect avec son but;
accorder des prêts ou des garanties à des associés ou des tiers, si cela favorise ses intérêts.
Capital social:
CHF 20'000.00.
Prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
selon statuts.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communications aux associés:
par écrit ou par courriel. Selon déclaration du 22.09.2021, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint.
Personne(s) inscrite(s):
Kordic, Nenad, ressortissant français, à Huningue (FR), associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 200 parts sociales de CHF 100.00;
Schneider, Frédéric, de Haute-Sorne, à Courroux, directeur, avec signature individuelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.