Reports for vbarchitekten. ag
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout vbarchitekten. ag
- vbarchitekten. ag in Thun is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Architectural and engineering activities». vbarchitekten. ag is active.
- There are 8 active persons registered in the management.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 28.09.2021. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-448.463.636.
Management (8)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Simon Wolfensberger,
Sabrina Iseli,
Borce Trendafilov,
Jürg Christoph Haller,
Manja Luther
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.02.2011
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Thun
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.049.876-9
UID/VAT
CHE-448.463.636
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb eines Architekturbüros. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Geschäfte tätigen und Verträge schliessen, die geeignet sind, den Geschäftszweck zu fördern oder direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an anderen Unternehmen, welche gleiche oder ähnliche Zwecke verfolgen, beteiligen oder solche Unternehmen erwerben. Sie kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten und Liegenschaften kaufen oder verkaufen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Reoplan Treuhand AG | Bern | 27.01.2016 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Thun | 08.07.2011 | 26.01.2016 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Viktor Burri AG Architekten
- K11 Beteiligungen AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: vbarchitekten. ag
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005299960, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
vbarchitekten. ag, in Thun, CHE-448.463.636, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 145 vom 29.07.2021, Publ. 1005260473).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wolfensberger, Simon, von Bauma, in Sumiswald, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit einem Mitglied.
Publication number: HR02-1005260473, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
vbarchitekten. ag, in Thun, CHE-448.463.636, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 150 vom 05.08.2020, Publ. 1004951856).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schertenleib, Michaela, von Heimiswil, in Steffisburg, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit einem Mitglied.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Iseli, Sabrina, von Lützelflüh, in Höfen b. Thun (Stocken-Höfen), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit einem Mitglied.
Publication number: HR02-1004951856, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Viktor Burri AG Architekten, in Thun, CHE-448.463.636, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 144 vom 29.07.2019, Publ. 1004685925).
Statutenänderung:
28.07.2020.
Firma neu:
vbarchitekten. ag.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre: schriftlich, mit Telefax oder mit elektronischer Post.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Steinmann, Thomas, von Treiten, in Steffisburg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.