Reports for Vaudoise Investment Solutions AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Vaudoise Investment Solutions AG
- Vaudoise Investment Solutions AG has its legal headquarters in Bern, is active and operates in the sector «Fund management».
- Vaudoise Investment Solutions AG has 7 persons entered in its management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 21.07.2022.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of BE is CHE-105.357.409.
- On the same address as Vaudoise Investment Solutions AG there are 7 other active companies registered. These include: Ärztenetzwerk Bern Praxis AG, BERNINVEST AG, Gruppenpraxis Schönburg AG.
Management (7)
newest board members
Stefan Franz Johann Schürmann,
Reto Kuhn,
Bertrand Desénépart
newest authorized signatories
Stefan Franz Johann Schürmann,
Reto Kuhn,
Dejan Dukov,
Marc Vifian,
Bertrand Desénépart
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.01.2000
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.3.024.916-0
UID/VAT
CHE-105.357.409
CHE-116.301.198 VAT
Sector
Fund management
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Verwalten von Vermögen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an andern Unternehmungen beteiligen, Unternehmen mit gleichartigem oder verwandtem Zweck erwerben oder errichten, Grundstücke erwerben und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Geschäftszweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt mit ihm in Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Bern | 09.07.2019 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Bern | 11.07.2017 | 08.07.2019 | |
Balmer-Etienne AG Bern | Bern | 26.07.2010 | 10.07.2017 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Vaudoise Investment Solutions Ltd.
- Vaudoise Investment Solutions SA
- Dr. Meyer Asset Management AG
- Meyer Dr. Asset Management AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Vaudoise Investment Solutions AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005525840, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Vaudoise Investment Solutions AG, in Bern, CHE-105.357.409, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 147 vom 31.07.2020, Publ. 1004949140).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Borgmann, Christoph, von Lugano, in Richterswil, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schürmann, Stefan, von Luzern, in Cossonay-Ville (Cossonay), Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004949140, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Vaudoise Investment Solutions AG, in Bern, CHE-105.357.409, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 130 vom 09.07.2019, Publ. 1004671035).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Laffely, Jean-Daniel, von Valeyres-sous-Rances, in Morges, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kuhn, Reto, von Dornach, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Borgmann, Christoph, von Lugano, in Richterswil, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Dukov, Dejan, von Gurmels, in Gurmels, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Fribourg].
Publication number: HR02-1004671035, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Vaudoise Investment Solutions AG, in Bern, CHE-105.357.409, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 174 vom 08.09.2017, Publ. 3741135).
Weitere Adressen:
Schönburgstrasse 19, Postfach, 3000 Bern 22.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
BDO AG (CHE-430.259.378), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ernst & Young AG (CHE-441.858.784), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.