Address
c/o Brigitte Oertli
Meierackerstrasse 34
8610 Uster
Reports for Uster on Ice
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Uster on Ice
- Uster on Ice has its legal headquarters in Uster and is active. It operates in the sector «Other services: entertainment and recreation».
- The organization was founded on 01.07.2020 and has 6 persons in its management.
- On the 16.07.2024 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the organization Uster on Ice is registered under the UID CHE-455.296.622.
- On the same address as Uster on Ice there are 4 other active companies registered. These include: Heinz Tschopp, InFocus GmbH, KarriereMACHER GmbH.
Management (6)
newest members of the committee
Alois Alexander Michael Heinz Gisler,
Joel Daniel Meier,
Patricia Simon,
Thomas Marc von Allmen,
Brigitte Oertli
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.07.2020
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Uster
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.6.002.722-3
UID/VAT
CHE-455.296.622
Sector
Other services: entertainment and recreation
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Der Verein bezweckt die Organisation und Produktion inkl. Durchführung von Uster on Ice, einer Eisbahn mit Gastronomie und Musik zur Förderung des Jugend- und Freizeitsports in Uster. Der Verein kann auch weitere Anlässe organisieren.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Uster on Ice
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006085329, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Uster on Ice, in Uster, CHE-455.296.622, Verein (SHAB Nr. 128 vom 06.07.2020, Publ. 1004928929).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gmür, Alice, von Sumiswald, in Kaltbrunn, Mitglied des Vorstandes, Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hofstetter, Patrick, von Wildhaus-Alt St. Johann, in Hombrechtikon, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gisler, Alois, von Neuheim, in Nürensdorf, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Meier, Joel, von Bäretswil, in Freienbach, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Simon, Patricia, von Reigoldswil, in Freienbach, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR01-1004928929, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Uster on Ice, in Uster, CHE-455.296.622, c/o Brigitte Oertli, Meierackerstrasse 34, 8610 Uster, Verein (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
01.04.2020.
Zweck:
Der Verein bezweckt die Organisation und Produktion inkl. Durchführung von Uster on Ice, einer Eisbahn mit Gastronomie und Musik zur Förderung des Jugend- und Freizeitsports in Uster. Der Verein kann auch weitere Anlässe organisieren.
Mittel:
Mittel: Erlös aus Veranstaltungen/Gastronomie, Gönnerbeiträge, Crowdfounding, Mitgliederbeiträgen, Beiträge aus öffentlicher Hand und Sponsoring.
Eingetragene Personen:
Oertli, Brigitte, von Uster, in Uster, Präsidentin des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
von Allmen, Thomas, von Zumikon, in Gossau (ZH), Vizepräsident des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gmür, Alice, von Sumiswald, in Kaltbrunn, Mitglied des Vorstandes, Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hofstetter, Patrick, von Wildhaus-Alt St. Johann, in Hombrechtikon, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Würth, Felix, von Zürich, in Rapperswil-Jona, Mitglied des Vorstandes, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.