Address
Oberwilerstrasse 10
6062 Wilen (Sarnen)
Reports for Ursula Strebel-Bildungs-Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Ursula Strebel-Bildungs-Stiftung
- Ursula Strebel-Bildungs-Stiftung from Wilen (Sarnen) operates in the sector «Other social services» and is active.
- The management has 4 active persons registered.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 20.06.2023.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register OW under the UID CHE-271.714.195.
- 8sources GmbH, Aare Sustainable Investments GmbH, All Nature Friends AG are registered at the same address.
Management (4)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Martin Peter Schwarz,
Ursula Steckholzer,
Walter Ernst Bruni
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.02.2023
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Sarnen
Commercial Registry Office
OW
Commercial register number
CH-140.7.440.650-8
UID/VAT
CHE-271.714.195
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Der Zweck der Stiftung ist die Leistung von finanzieller Hilfe für die Ausbildung von minderbemittelten Kindern, Jugendlichen und jungen Erwachsenen in den Gründungskantonen der Eidgenossenschaft, Uri, Schwyz und Unterwalden (bestehend aus Obwalden und Nidwalden). Die Stiftung hilft direkt den Betroffenen mittels einmaligen oder wiederkehrenden Unterstützungsbeiträgen oder mittels rückzahlbaren Ausbildungsdarlehen. Die Stiftung kann auch Institutionen und Aktionen mit der genannten Zielsetzung unterstützen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
UBG Audit AG | Zürich | 10.02.2023 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Ursula Strebel-Bildungs-Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005772699, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Ursula Strebel-Bildungs-Stiftung, in Sarnen, CHE-271.714.195, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 29 vom 10.02.2023, Publ. 1005675238).
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
Zentralschweizer BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht (ZBSA), in Luzern. Errichtung der Stiftung durch öffentliche letztwillige Verfügungen vom 15.11.2019 und 11.06.2020.
Publication number: HR01-1005675238, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Ursula Strebel-Bildungs-Stiftung, in Sarnen, CHE-271.714.195, Oberwilerstrasse 10, 6062 Wilen (Sarnen), Stiftung (Neueintragung).
Urkundendatum:
15.11.2019. 11.06.2020.
Zweck:
Der Zweck der Stiftung ist die Leistung von finanzieller Hilfe für die Ausbildung von minderbemittelten Kindern, Jugendlichen und jungen Erwachsenen in den Gründungskantonen der Eidgenossenschaft, Uri, Schwyz und Unterwalden (bestehend aus Obwalden und Nidwalden). Die Stiftung hilft direkt den Betroffenen mittels einmaligen oder wiederkehrenden Unterstützungsbeiträgen oder mittels rückzahlbaren Ausbildungsdarlehen. Die Stiftung kann auch Institutionen und Aktionen mit der genannten Zielsetzung unterstützen.
Eingetragene Personen:
Schwarz, Martin Peter, von Zofingen, in Eglisau, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bruni, Walter Ernst, von Amsoldingen, in Sarnen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Steckholzer, Ursula, von Stäfa, in Dietlikon, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
UBG Audit AG (CHE-101.489.822), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.