Reports for Urs Brunner Human Engineering AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Urs Brunner Human Engineering AG
- Urs Brunner Human Engineering AG is active in the industry «IT services» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Elsau.
- The company was founded on 20.08.1987 and has 2 persons in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 15.08.2008.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-106.159.007.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.08.1987
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Elsau
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.904.107-6
UID/VAT
CHE-106.159.007
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Beratung, Planung und Engineering in den Bereichen Kommunikation, IT und Organisation sowie Software Entwicklung; kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Revisora Revisionsgesellschaft AG | Wattwil | 17.07.2007 | 14.08.2008 | |
Künzle Treuhand AG | Rapperswil-Jona | <2004 | 16.07.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Brunner Urs Human Engineering AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Urs Brunner Human Engineering AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4614206, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Urs Brunner Human Engineering AG, in Dietikon, CH-020.3.904.107-6, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 27.12.2007, S. 39, Publ. 4263036).
Statutenänderung:
18.07.2008.
Sitz neu:
Elsau.
Domizil neu:
Auwiesenstrasse 10, 8352 Elsau. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 05.08.2008 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Revisora Revisionsgesellschaft AG, in Wattwil, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 4263036, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Urs Brunner Human Engineering AG, bisher in Winterthur, CH-020.3.904.107-6, Planung und Engineering in Kommunikation, IT und Organisation, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 233 vom 30.11.2007, S. 25, Publ. 4225008).
Statutenänderung:
30.11.2007.
Sitz neu:
Dietikon.
Domizil neu:
Rüternstrasse 12a, 8953 Dietikon.
Aktien neu:
120 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.-- [bisher: 60 Namenaktien zu CHF 2'000.--].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brunner, Urs, von Stetten SH, in Dietikon, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Winterthur, Mitglied];
Komenda, Renée, von Zürich, in Dietikon, Mitglied und Sekretärin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 4225008, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Urs Brunner Human Engineering AG, in Winterthur, CH-020.3.904.107-6, Beratung, Planung und Engineering in den Bereichen Kommunikation, IT und Organisation, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 17.07.2007, S. 24, Publ. 4028726).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brunner-Romer, Barbara, von Stetten SH, in Winterthur, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brunner, Urs, von Stetten SH, in Winterthur, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident und Geschäftsführer].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.