Reports for Uplift Group AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Uplift Group AG
- Uplift Group AG is active in the industry «IT services» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Luzern.
- Uplift Group AG was founded on 14.06.2016.
- The last commercial register change was made on 24.06.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- Uplift Group AG is registered in the Canton of LU under the UID CHE-178.948.150.
- On the same address as Uplift Group AG there are 41 other active companies registered. These include: A & K Beteiligungs AG, Arvium AG, AWB Group AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.06.2016
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.043.403-6
UID/VAT
CHE-178.948.150
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Entwicklung von IT- und Technologielösungen im Bereich der Luftfahrt im In- und Ausland sowie die Erbringung damit zusammenhängender Dienstleistungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Uplift Group SA
- Uplift Group Ltd
- Palmare AG
- Palmare Ltd
- Palmare SA
- Palmarium Lifestyle AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Uplift Group AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006064801, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Uplift Group AG, in Luzern, CHE-178.948.150, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 63 vom 30.03.2023, Publ. 1005712992).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Archer, Suzanei Lynne, kanadische Staatsangehörige, in Luzern, Vizepräsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Wild, Patrick Albert, von Zürich, in Egg, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Auerbach, Ilya Raphael, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Luzern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005712992, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Uplift Group AG, in Luzern, CHE-178.948.150, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 26 vom 08.02.2021, Publ. 1005094291).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Olver, Niall Grant, von Gontenschwil, in Zumikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005094291, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Palmare AG, in Luzern, CHE-178.948.150, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 171 vom 05.09.2019, Publ. 1004709648).
Statutenänderung:
18.01.2021.
Firma neu:
Uplift Group AG.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(Uplift Group SA) (Uplift Group Ltd).
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Entwicklung von IT- und Technologielösungen im Bereich der Luftfahrt im In- und Ausland sowie die Erbringung damit zusammenhängender Dienstleistungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Aktien neu:
1'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00 [bisher: 1'000 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 100.00].
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail. [Weitere Änderungen berühren keine publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zimmermann, Mathias, von Ehrendingen, in Schaffhausen, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Olver, Niall Grant, von Gontenschwil, in Zumikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.