Reports for Uni'Vert SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Uni'Vert SA
- Uni'Vert SA with its legal headquarters in Bulle is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Gardening and landscaping». Uni'Vert SA is active.
- The company was founded on 31.01.2000.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 22.03.2010.
- The company is registered in the commercial register FR under the UID CHE-105.400.229.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.01.2000
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bulle
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.431.561-5
UID/VAT
CHE-105.400.229
Sector
Gardening and landscaping
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
eEploitation d'une entreprise de jardinage, horticulteur, paysagiste. (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FIDU-GIBLOUX SA | Gibloux | <2004 | 21.03.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Uni'Vert SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5551914, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Uni'Vert SA, à Bulle, CH-217-0431561-5, l'exploitation d'un garden centre ainsi que le commerce de tous biens. (FOSC du 25.02.2000, p. 1306). Statuts modifiés le 11.03.2010.
Nouveau but:
exploitation d'une entreprise de jardinage, horticulteur, paysagiste. (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Communication aux actionnaires:
par écrit, par fax ou par courriel. Wehren Jean-Pierre n'est plus administrateur, sa signature est radiée. Seydoux Nicolas, jusqu'ici président, devient administrateur unique avec signature individuelle. Fiduciaire Bulliard & Maradan SA n'est plus organe de révision. Selon déclaration du 11.03.2010, la société n'est pas soumise à un contrôle ordinaire et renonce à un contrôle restreint.
Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Complément Uni'Vert SA, à B u l l e (FOSC du 11.02.2000, no 30, p. 960). Restriction dans la transmissibilité des actions.
Convocation:
lettre recommandée.
Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Uni'Vert SA, à B u l l e. Nouvelle société anonyme.
Date des statuts:
28 janvier 2000.
But:
l'exploitation d'un garden centre ainsi que le commerce de tous biens.
Capital-actions:
fr. 100 000, divisé en 100 actions nominatives de fr. 1000, entièrement libérées en espèces.
Publication:
FOSC.
Conseil d' administration:
Nicolas Seydoux, de Vaulruz, à Neyruz, président;
Jean-Pierre Wehren, de Saanen, à La Tour-de-Trême, secrétaire. Signature collective à deux du président et du secrétaire.
Organe de révision:
-Fiduciaire Bulliard & Maradan SA, à Farvagny-le-Grand.
Adresse:
route de la Part-Dieu 12.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.