Reports for Uniman S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Uniman S.A.
- Uniman S.A. is currently active and the industry «Temp agency services». The legal headquarters are in Lausanne.
- The management of the company Uniman S.A. consists of 4 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 24.03.2005.
- On the 18.07.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-112.288.363.
- KB MEDICAL SA, Paradise Massothérapie Esthétique Vieira Lopes have the same address as Uniman S.A..
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Corinne Besuchet,
Gabriele Mangione,
Salvatore Mangione,
Christian Favre
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.03.2005
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Lausanne
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.043.559-8
UID/VAT
CHE-112.288.363
Sector
Temp agency services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Placement de personnel fixe et temporaire, gestion de salaires, conseil en personnel, services de recrutement; conseils, suivi, administration et gestion de ressources humaines; assistance et expertise dans les domaines administratifs, commerciaux, techniques et de gestion.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BfB Fidam révision SA | Renens (VD) | 12.07.2013 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA | Genève | 05.04.2012 | 11.07.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Uniman S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006088509, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Uniman S.A., à Lausanne, CHE-112.288.363 (FOSC du 09.11.2018, p. 0/1004494825). Pessina Gianluca n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Signature collective à deux, avec Favre Christian est conférée à Besuchet Corinne, de L'Abergement, à Lutry, et Mangione Gabriele, de Italie, à Lausanne.
Publication number: HR02-1004494825, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Uniman S.A., à Lausanne, CHE-112.288.363 (FOSC du 22.04.2014, p. 0/1463079). Mangione Salvatore est maintenant d'Etoy et est nommé président.
Nouveaux administrateurs avec signature collective à deux:
Pessina Gianluca, d'Italie, à Lissone (Italie), secrétaire, et Favre Christian, de Pully, à Villars-Sainte-Croix.
Publication number: 1463079, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Uniman S.A., à Lausanne, CHE-112.288.363 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). La signature de Grunder Jérôme est radiée.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.