Reports for TZO GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout TZO GmbH
- TZO GmbH with its legal headquarters in Wetzikon ZH is a Limited liability company from the sector «Transportation of passenger and freight by road». TZO GmbH is active.
- TZO GmbH was founded on 08.10.2014.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 28.02.2024.
- TZO GmbH is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-312.748.762.
- On the same address there are 4 other active companies registered. These include: Aweso AG, EMA Spielparadies, Inh. Ursprung, emo Emil Mohr AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.10.2014
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Wetzikon (ZH)
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.053.838-4
UID/VAT
CHE-312.748.762
Sector
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Führung eines Taxiunternehmens sowie den Betrieb einer Taxizentrale; Übernahme, Vermittlung und Ausführung von Personen- und Warentransporten sowie Kurierdiensten; Vermietung und Vermittlung von Taxidiensten- und Transportmitteln. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: TZO GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005972418, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
TZO GmbH, in Wetzikon (ZH), CHE-312.748.762, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 217 vom 08.11.2023, Publ. 1005879302).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Akköprü, Seydi, von Rüti (ZH), in Rüti (ZH), Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Akköprü-Bodmer, Yamina Anastasia, von Rüti (ZH), in Wald (ZH), Gesellschafterin und Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Publication number: HR02-1005879302, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
TZO GmbH, in Wetzikon (ZH), CHE-312.748.762, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 167 vom 30.08.2021, Publ. 1005279770).
Domizil neu:
Zürcherstrasse 35, 8620 Wetzikon ZH.
Publication number: HR02-1005279770, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
TZO GmbH, in Wetzikon (ZH), CHE-312.748.762, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 208 vom 26.10.2020, Publ. 1005007603).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Akköprü, Ömer, von Rüti (ZH), in Wetzikon (ZH), Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Akköprü, Seydi, von Rüti (ZH), in Rüti (ZH), Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, ohne Stammanteil].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.