Reports for ttwe schweiz ag
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout ttwe schweiz ag
- ttwe schweiz ag has its legal headquarters in Kaiseraugst and is active. It operates in the sector «Repair and installation of machines and equipment».
- The management of the company ttwe schweiz ag, which was founded on the 22.04.2015, consists of 3 persons.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 17.11.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company's UID is CHE-307.056.581.
- SAG Sunshine I Switzerland Holding AG, SAG Sunshine II Switzerland Holding AG, Solvias AG have the same address as ttwe schweiz ag.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.04.2015
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Kaiseraugst
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.039.577-5
UID/VAT
CHE-307.056.581
Sector
Repair and installation of machines and equipment
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Vertrieb und Service von Temperatur- und Klimaprüfschränken, begehbaren Klimakammern sowie Kühlzellen; kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Lizenzen, Patente und andere immaterielle Werte erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: ttwe schweiz ag
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005887856, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
ttwe schweiz ag, in Kaiseraugst, CHE-307.056.581, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 53 vom 18.03.2019, Publ. 1004589899).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Klein, Dominik, von Basel, in Oberwil (BL), mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Liestal].
Publication number: HR02-1004589899, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
ttwe schweiz ag, in Kaiseraugst, CHE-307.056.581, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 79 vom 27.04.2015, S.0, Publ. 2119883).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wüsthoff, Kai, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Hohenstein (DE), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Habich, Julia, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Weilburg (DE), Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 2119883, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
ttwe schweiz ag, in Kaiseraugst, CHE-307.056.581, Römerpark 2, 4303 Kaiseraugst, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
16.04.2015.
Zweck:
Vertrieb und Service von Temperatur- und Klimaprüfschränken, begehbaren Klimakammern sowie Kühlzellen;
kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Lizenzen, Patente und andere immaterielle Werte erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 50'000.00.
Aktien:
100 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Alle Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen schriftlich (einschliesslich Telefax oder E-Mail) unter Vorbehalt abweichender gesetzlicher oder statutarischer Bestimmungen.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung aller Gründer vom 16.04.2015 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Habich, Fabian, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Weilburg (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Wüsthoff, Kai, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Hohenstein (DE), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Klein, Dominik, von Basel, in Liestal, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.