Reports for Truvis AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Truvis AG
- Truvis AG with its legal headquarters in Basel is active. Truvis AG operates in the sector «IT services».
- Truvis AG has one person entered in its management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 06.10.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- Truvis AG is registered in the Canton of BS under the UID CHE-386.379.456.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.11.2017
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Basel
Commercial Registry Office
BS
Commercial register number
CH-270.3.015.612-4
UID/VAT
CHE-386.379.456
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Beratung, den Soft- und Hardwareverkauf, die Implementierung sowie alle Dienstleistungen im Bereich der IT. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an andern Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, Vertretungen übernehmen sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sein können, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für verbundene Unternehmen und Dritte eingehen. Sie kann Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern, jedoch mit Auschluss Immobiliengeschäften gemäss Bundesgesetz über den Erwerb von Grundstücken durch Personen im Ausland.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
TRUVIS | 27.02.2018 | active | 50639/2018 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Truvis AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005854632, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Truvis AG, in Basel, CHE-386.379.456, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 101 vom 25.05.2022, Publ. 1005481823).
Domizil neu:
St. Alban-Ring 237, 4052 Basel.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fornaro, Dr. Peter Renato, von Känerkinden, in Binningen, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Oberli, Adrian, von Basel, in Riehen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005481823, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Truvis AG, in Basel, CHE-386.379.456, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 218 vom 11.11.2019, Publ. 1004756511).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Thoenen, Dr. Gert, von Reutigen, in Binningen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Eggenberger, Christian, von Basel, in Binningen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kaiser, Aeneas, von Büron, in Basel, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit einem Mitglied.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Oberli, Adrian, von Basel, in Riehen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004756511, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Truvis AG, in Basel, CHE-386.379.456, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 231 vom 28.11.2017, Publ. 3896315).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bianco, Andrea, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Füllinsdorf, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit einem Mitglied.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.