Branches (4)
Reports for TOPNET SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout TOPNET SA
- TOPNET SA has its legal headquarters in Grand-Lancy and is active. It operates in the sector «Cleaning of buildings».
- The management of the company TOPNET SA consists of 6 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 28.11.1995.
- On the 23.06.2023 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the company TOPNET SA is registered under the UID CHE-107.446.797.
- Companies with an identical address: AGA Alessio Gianfranceschi architecte, Aigal Studio Emeric Caron, Atelier d'Art, Riesen Jacky.
Management (6)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Pedro Amaro Gonçalves Fernandes,
Sandra Pereira Rodrigues,
Vanessa da Roxa,
José Ramon Liste,
Andrès Manuel Muino
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.11.1995
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Lancy
Commercial Registry Office
GE
Commercial register number
CH-660.1.553.995-6
UID/VAT
CHE-107.446.797
Sector
Cleaning of buildings
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Prestations de nettoyage, d'hygiène et de services dans le domaine de l'entretien, de la maintenance et de l'exploitation de bâtiments, de matériels et de leur environnement; prestations de services aux utilisateurs de locaux et à leur environnement; prestation de désinfection et de traitement des déchets; -prestations de conseil et de formation professionnelle dans le domaine du nettoyage et de services; placement et/ou mise à disposition de personnel fixe ou temporaire (location de services); prestations de services de conciergerie pour personnes physiques ou morales (facility services) comprenant notamment un service de réception, d'hôtellerie, d'entretien, de rénovation ou de réparation de tout espace intérieur ou extérieur, privé ou commun; importation, achat, vente, distribution de produits et appareils dans les domaines de la société; exploitation d'une entreprise générale d'informatique, fourniture de service, de développement d'applications, vente de matériel, planification de réseaux, conception de sites web. La société a également pour but l'exploitation d'une entreprise générale d'informatique, la fourniture de service, de développement d'applications, la vente de matériel, la planification de réseaux, la conception de sites web. La société peut créer des succursales ou des filiales en Suisse et à l'étranger, participer à d'autres entreprises en Suisse et à l'étranger, acquérir ou fonder des entreprises dans tous les secteurs d'activité, faire toutes opérations et conclure tous contrats propres à développer son but ou s'y rapportant directement ou indirectement. La société peut également accorder des prêts à ses actionnaires et à des sociétés du groupe, se solidariser, cautionner, se porter-fort des prêts consentis par des tiers à ses actionnaires ou à des sociétés du groupe.
Auditor
Former auditor (5)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fehlmann & Associés SA | Genève | 03.03.2022 | 09.07.2024 | |
Comtesas + Gerficom SA | Genève | 26.04.2019 | 02.03.2022 | |
Guggenheim Révision SA | Genève | 05.08.2008 | 25.04.2019 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- TOPNET SA GE
- Top-Net Services SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: TOPNET SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005777197, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
TOPNET SA, à Lancy, CHE-107.446.797 (FOSC du 02.03.2023, p. 0/1005691802). Signature individuelle a été conférée à Gonçalves Fernandes Pedro Amaro, du Portugal, à Boulens, directeur.
Publication number: HR02-1005760752, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
TOPNET SA, à Lancy, CHE-107.446.797 (FOSC du 02.03.2023, p. 0/1005691802). Inscription de la mention de l'existence d'une succursale à Monthey (CHE-375.793.946).
Publication number: HR02-1005691802, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
TOPNET SA, à Lancy, CHE-107.446.797 (FOSC du 11.11.2022, p. 0/1005602896). Les pouvoirs de Böhlen Delphine sont radiés. La directrice Pereira Rodrigues Sandra signe désormais individuellement;
ses pouvoirs sont modifiés en ce sens.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.