Reports for Topacryl AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Topacryl AG
- Topacryl AG has its legal headquarters in Schönenwerd and is active. It operates in the sector «Manufacturing of rubber and plastic products».
- The management of the company Topacryl AG consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 09.01.1996.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 22.05.2019, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of SO is CHE-108.395.091.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.01.1996
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Schönenwerd
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-249.3.004.429-0
UID/VAT
CHE-108.395.091
Sector
Manufacturing of rubber and plastic products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fabrikation von und Handel mit organischem Glas. Betreibt Schulung und technische Beratung auf dem Fachgebiet organisches Glas. Kann sich an andern Unternehmungen beteiligen, Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Solidis Revisions AG | Olten | <2004 | 16.12.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Topacryl Ltd
- Topacryl SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Topacryl AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004635803, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Topacryl AG, in Schönenwerd, CHE-108.395.091, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 212 vom 01.11.2017, Publ. 3843479).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Suter, Ivo, von Weggis, in Lostorf, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Suter-van der Veer, Bauktje Ella, von Emmen, in Lostorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3843479, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Topacryl AG, in Schönenwerd, CHE-108.395.091, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 245 vom 17.12.2009, Publ. 5397932).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Suter, Ivo, von Weggis, in Lostorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Bellmund].
Publication number: 5397932, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Topacryl AG, in Schönenwerd, CH-249.3.004.429-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 119 vom 23.06.2008, S. 14, Publ. 4537600).
Statutenänderung:
10.12.2009.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände:
[Die Bestimmungen betreffend die Sachübernahme und die beabsichtigte Sachübernahme bei der Gründung der Gesellschaft vom 05.01.1996 sind im Sinne von Art. 628 Abs. 4 OR aus den Statuten gestrichen worden.] [gestrichen: Sachübernahme: von der Forbo-CTU AG, in Schönenwerd, Maschinen und Mobiliar der Abteilung Kunststoffproduktion zum Preis von CHF 42'387.25.] [gestrichen: Beabsichtigte Sachübernahme: von der Forbo-CTU AG, in Schönenwerd, das zur Abteilung Kunststoffproduktion gehörende Warenlager per 31.12.1995 zum Maximalpreis von CHF 120'000.--.]. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 10.12.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft der ordentlichen Revision nicht und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sudan Partner AG, in Olten, Revisionsstelle;
Agnoli, Willy Frank, von Starrkirch-Wil, in Aarau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Suter, Ivo, von Weggis, in Bellmund, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.