Reports for TOP TRANSFERS Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout TOP TRANSFERS Sàrl
- TOP TRANSFERS Sàrl from Cointrin operates in the sector «Transportation of passenger and freight by road» and is active.
- There is one active person registered in the management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 20.10.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company TOP TRANSFERS Sàrl is the following: CHE-113.409.327.
- Companies with an identical address: Alpes Décor Sàrl, Alpha Office Sàrl, ARCHIBOUAK'S SAMAKE.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.01.2007
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Meyrin
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.537.144-5
UID/VAT
CHE-113.409.327
Sector
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Le service de taxi, le transport de personnes, notamment location de voitures et limousines avec ou sans chauffeur, en Suisse et en Europe, notamment vers les stations de ski, ainsi que l'exploitation de moyens de transports routiers, maritimes et aériens, la fourniture de prestations en relation avec le voyage et le tourisme et la livraison de colis et marchandises en Suisse et en Europe. La société peut faire, soit pour son compte, soit pour le compte de tiers, toutes opérations financières, commerciales, industrielles, immobilières ou mobilières, en rapport direct ou indirect avec son but social, créer des succursales à l'étranger ou des filiales en Suisse et à l'étranger, participer à toutes entreprises ayant un rapport direct ou indirect avec son but et accorder des prêts ou des garanties à des associés ou des tiers, si cela favorise ses intérêts. La clause statutaire d'apport en nature du 25.01.2007 est abrogée.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fidexpert SA La Gruyère | Bulle | 20.09.2010 | 11.01.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Global Cars Sàrl
- CARAVELA Sàrl
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: TOP TRANSFERS Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005866080, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
TOP TRANSFERS Sàrl, précédemment à Bulle, CHE-113.409.327 (FOSC du 10.09.2020, p. 0/1004976051).
Nouveau siège:
Meyrin, Avenue Louis-Casaï 71, 1216 Cointrin. Statuts modifiés le 21.09.2023. Dos Santos Fernandes Filipe André n'est plus associé, ni gérant;
ses pouvoirs sont radiés;
ses 20 parts de CHF 1'000 ont été cédées à Francisco Lénia Sofia, de et à Bernex, nouvelle associée-gérante pour 20 parts de CHF 1'000 avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005865538, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
TOP TRANSFERS Sàrl, à Bulle, CHE-113.409.327 (FOSC du 10.09.2020, p. 0/1004976051). Cette entité juridique est radiée du registre du commerce du canton de Fribourg, par suite du transfert du siège à Meyrin.
Publication number: HR02-1004976051, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
TOP TRANSFERS Sàrl, à Bulle, CHE-113.409.327 (FOSC du 01.02.2019, p. 0/1004556389).
Complément:
l'inscription n° 616 du 29.01.2019 (FOSC du 01.02.2019, Id 1004556389) est complétée dans ce sens: Les clauses statutaires relatives aux obligations statutaires de fournir des prestations accessoires, aux droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption sont radiées.
Personnes radiées:
Pereira de Carvalho Emanuel, associé, 10 parts de CHF 1'000, gérant, président, signature collective à deux;
Franco Gomes Nuno Miguel, associé, 10 parts de CHF 1'000, gérant, signature collective à deux.
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
Dos Santos Fernandes Filipe André, du Portugal, à Perly-Certoux, associé, 20 parts de CHF 1'000, gérant, signature individuelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.