Address
Haldenstrasse 11
3550 Langnau im Emmental
Reports for TOL AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout TOL AG
- TOL AG has its legal headquarters in Langnau im Emmental and is active. It operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management consists of 3 persons. The company was founded on 18.12.2008.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 22.06.2023.
- The company TOL AG is registered under the UID CHE-114.639.835.
- There are 2 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Nunil AG, Taxi Beutler Langnau.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.12.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Langnau im Emmental
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.043.638-6
UID/VAT
CHE-114.639.835
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Kauf und Verkauf von Immobilien sowie Dienstleistungen jeder Art im Immobilienbereich, insbesondere das Verwalten von Liegenschaften. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen im In- und Ausland beteiligen oder solche Unternehmungen übernehmen, Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte durchführen, die mit dem Gesellschaftszweck direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang stehen oder ihn zu fördern geeignet sind. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Dr.Meyer Treuhand AG | Bern | 24.12.2008 | 19.03.2015 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- TOL Holding AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: TOL AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005775040, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
TOL AG, in Langnau im Emmental, CHE-114.639.835, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 127 vom 03.07.2020, Publ. 1004927758).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lenz-Rohrer, Christine, von Biglen und Arni (BE), in Langnau im Emmental, Vizepräsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lenz, Nicolas, von Biglen und Arni (BE), in Greng, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Biglen und Arni (BE), Mitglied und Sekretär des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Lenz, Anton, von Biglen und Arni (BE), in Langnau im Emmental, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Lenz, Mireille, von Tafers, in Greng, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004927758, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
TOL AG, in Langnau im Emmental, CHE-114.639.835, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 55 vom 20.03.2015, S.0, Publ. 2055037).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lenz, Anton, von Biglen und Arni (BE), in Langnau im Emmental, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Lenz-Rohrer, Christine, von Biglen und Arni (BE), in Langnau im Emmental, Vizepräsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Vizepräsidentin, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Lenz, Nicolas, von Biglen und Arni (BE), in Greng, Mitglied und Sekretär des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Bern, Mitglied und Sekretär, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 2055037, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
TOL AG, in Langnau im Emmental, CHE-114.639.835, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 116 vom 19.06.2014, Publ. 1562585).
Domizil neu:
Haldenstrasse 11, 3550 Langnau im Emmental. Gemäss Erklärung vom 12.03.2015 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Altra Treuhand AG (CHE-108.133.958), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.