Reports for Töss Energie AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Töss Energie AG
- Töss Energie AG with its legal headquarters in Winterthur is active. Töss Energie AG operates in the sector «Electrical power production and utilities».
- Töss Energie AG was founded on 17.03.2011.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 05.07.2024.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of ZH is CHE-245.983.039.
- On the same address as Töss Energie AG there are 5 other active companies registered. These include: Joh. Jacob Rieter-Stiftung, Nordstrom GmbH, Rieter Stiftung.
Management (6)
newest board members
Antje Schwarz,
Michael Otto Schier,
Kurt Frei,
Jürg Bischofberger
newest authorized signatories
Antje Schwarz,
Michael Otto Schier,
Kurt Frei,
Thomas Martin Anwander,
Jürg Bischofberger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.03.2011
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Winterthur
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.036.325-9
UID/VAT
CHE-245.983.039
Sector
Electrical power production and utilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Planung und den Betrieb von Anlagen zur Stromerzeugung, vor allem im Bereich erneuerbare Energien. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke und Immaterialgüterrechte im In- und Ausland erwerben, halten, verwalten, verwerten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, die geeignet erscheinen, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die mit diesem zusammenhängen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- RiRe Consulting AG
- Autoneum AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Töss Energie AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006076599, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Töss Energie AG, in Winterthur, CHE-245.983.039, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 143 vom 26.07.2023, Publ. 1005804089).
Domizil neu:
Klosterstrasse 14, 8406 Winterthur.
Publication number: HR02-1005804089, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Töss Energie AG, in Winterthur, CHE-245.983.039, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 192 vom 04.10.2019, Publ. 1004730155).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schwarz, Antje, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Buch am Irchel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004730155, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Töss Energie AG, in Winterthur, CHE-245.983.039, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 69 vom 09.04.2019, Publ. 1004606183).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Göbel, Martin, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schier, Michael Otto, von Benken (SG), in Uznach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.