Reports for Rieter Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Rieter Stiftung
- Rieter Stiftung is currently active and the industry «Operation of an pension fund». The legal headquarters are in Winterthur.
- The management of the organization Rieter Stiftung, which was founded on the 20.12.2011, consists of 5 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 22.07.2024.
- The organization's UID is CHE-315.393.106.
- On the same address as Rieter Stiftung there are 5 other active companies registered. These include: Joh. Jacob Rieter-Stiftung, Nordstrom GmbH, Töss Campus AG.
Management (5)
newest members of the Foundation Board
newest authorized signatories
Daniel Gambon,
Karim Aouami,
Thomas Martin Anwander,
Kurt Frei
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.12.2011
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Winterthur
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.001.805-6
UID/VAT
CHE-315.393.106
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt für Mitarbeiter der Maschinenfabrik Rieter AG (sowie der wirtschaftlich und finanziell eng mit ihr verbundenen Unternehmen) a) den Betrieb oder Unterstützung der Personalrestaurants auf den Arealen Klosterstrasse 30 und Schlosstalstrasse 43 in 8406 Winterthur b) die Unterstützung von Ausbildungsprogrammen im Bereich Textilmaschinenbau, insbesondere der Lehrlingsausbildung c) die Unterstützung von Projekten im Bereich Arbeitssicherheit und Gesundheitsvorsorge.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Consultive Revisions AG | Winterthur | 26.07.2023 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Winterthur | 23.12.2011 | 25.07.2023 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Rieter Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006089997, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Rieter Stiftung, in Winterthur, CHE-315.393.106, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 05.07.2024, Publ. 1006076569).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ritter, Richard, von Altstätten, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gambon, Daniel, von Domleschg, in Marthalen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006076569, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Rieter Stiftung, in Winterthur, CHE-315.393.106, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 143 vom 26.07.2023, Publ. 1005804067).
Domizil neu:
Klosterstrasse 14, 8406 Winterthur.
Publication number: HR02-1005804067, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Rieter Stiftung, in Winterthur, CHE-315.393.106, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 219 vom 10.11.2020, Publ. 1005018880).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG (CHE-106.839.438), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Consultive Revisions AG (CHE-105.253.715), in Winterthur, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.