Reports for Tobura AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Tobura AG
- Tobura AG has its legal headquarters in Winterthur and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Repair and installation of machines and equipment».
- The management has 4 active persons registered.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 30.06.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- Tobura AG is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-107.163.566.
- Companies with the same address as Tobura AG: BU Holding AG, Carl Heinrich Ernst - Kunststiftung, ETO Holding AG.
Management (4)
newest board members
Marlise Blaser Kolb,
Jörg Markus Lütolf,
Truls Henrik Toggenburger
newest authorized signatories
Aleksander Golcar,
Marlise Blaser Kolb,
Jörg Markus Lütolf,
Truls Henrik Toggenburger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.09.1945
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Winterthur
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.926.469-0
UID/VAT
CHE-107.163.566
Sector
Repair and installation of machines and equipment
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Ausführung von Reparaturen an Kieswerkanlagen, Baumaschinen und Fahrzeugen sowie Konstruktion von und Handel mit solchen Anlagen, Maschinen und ihren Zubehörteilen; der Gesellschaft ist im übrigen die Beteiligung an anderen Unternehmungen gestattet.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Zürich | 30.11.2009 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | St. Gallen | <2004 | 29.11.2009 |
Other company names
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Tobura AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005782563, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Tobura AG, in Winterthur, CHE-107.163.566, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 28 vom 09.02.2023, Publ. 1005673767).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gramm, Werner, von Zürich, in Zuzwil SG, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Golcar, Aleksander, von Bäretswil, in Stäfa, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005673767, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Tobura AG, in Winterthur, CHE-107.163.566, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 194 vom 08.10.2019, Publ. 1004732277).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Albrecht, Dr. Franz-Josef, von Sursee, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004732277, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Tobura AG, in Winterthur, CHE-107.163.566, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 36 vom 21.02.2011, S.27, Publ. 6041852).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Blaser, Marlise, von Langnau im Emmental, in Märstetten, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.