Reports for Tobie Catering Management SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Tobie Catering Management SA
- Tobie Catering Management SA is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Verbier. Tobie Catering Management SA belongs to the industry «Operation of restaurants» and is currently active.
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 12.06.2008.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 10.08.2023.
- Tobie Catering Management SA is registered in the Canton of VS under the UID CHE-114.348.059.
- The address is identical with 3 other active companies. These include: Kawai SA, Les Retrouvailles Sàrl, RAMAMA Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.06.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Val de Bagnes
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.3.007.218-5
UID/VAT
CHE-114.348.059
Sector
Operation of restaurants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'un établissement public à Verbier.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiva Audit SA | Sion | 09.05.2023 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alpina Révision Verbier SA | Val de Bagnes | 30.10.2020 | 08.05.2023 | |
Dini & Associés SA | Martigny | 18.06.2008 | 29.10.2020 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Tobie Catering Management SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005814240, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Tobie Catering Management SA, à Val de Bagnes, CHE-114.348.059, société anonyme (No. FOSC 89 du 09.05.2023, Publ. 1005742201).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Fiva Audit SA (CHE-114.588.095), à Sion, organe de révision [précédemment: AAA Audit Sàrl (CHE-114.588.095)].
Publication number: HR02-1005742201, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Tobie Catering Management SA, à Val de Bagnes, CHE-114.348.059, société anonyme (No. FOSC 63 du 30.03.2022, Publ. 1005439088).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Alpina Révision Verbier SA (CHE-114.897.320), à Bagnes, organe de révision.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
AAA Audit Sàrl (CHE-114.588.095), à Sion, organe de révision.
Publication number: HR02-1005439088, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Tobie Catering Management SA, à Val de Bagnes, CHE-114.348.059, société anonyme (No. FOSC 110 du 10.06.2021, Publ. 1005213487).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Igelman, Norbert Francis, citoyen français, à Verbier (Bagnes), président, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Igelman, Raphaël, citoyen français, à Val de Bagnes, administrateur unique, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: à Bagnes, secrétaire, avec signature individuelle].