Address
c/o Toggenburger AG
Schlossackerstrasse 20
8404 Winterthur
Reports for Tobag Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Tobag Stiftung
- Tobag Stiftung is active in the industry «Operation of an pension fund» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Winterthur.
- The management has 4 active persons registered.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 04.07.2023. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-110.397.248.
- On the same address there are 8 other active companies registered. These include: BU Holding AG, Carl Heinrich Ernst - Kunststiftung, ETO Holding AG.
Management (4)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Aleksander Golcar,
Matthias Hasler,
Truls Henrik Toggenburger
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Aleksander Golcar,
Matthias Hasler,
Truls Henrik Toggenburger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.01.1984
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Winterthur
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.904.761-1
UID/VAT
CHE-110.397.248
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Vorsorge für die Arbeitnehmer der Stifterfima "Toggenburger AG", in Winterthur, und der angeschlossenen Firmen und ihre Angehörigen und Hinterlassenen sowie Personen, für die der Arbeitnehmer nachweisbar bis zuletzt gesorgt hat, gegen die wirtschaftlichen Folgen von Alter, Invalidität und Tod, sowie in Notlagen wie bei Krankheit, Unfall, Invalidität und Arbeitslosigkeit.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Zürich | 30.11.2009 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | St. Gallen | 02.06.2006 | 29.11.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Tobag-Stiftung
- Tobur-Stiftung
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Tobag Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005785427, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Tobag Stiftung, in Winterthur, CHE-110.397.248, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 153 vom 12.08.2013, S.0, Publ. 1022397).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gramm, Werner, von Zürich, in Zuzwil SG, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Golcar, Aleksander, von Bäretswil, in Stäfa, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hasler, Matthias, von Zürich, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1022397, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Tobag Stiftung, in Winterthur, CH-020.7.904.761-1, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 159 vom 17.08.2012, Publ. 6813968).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Toggenburger, Heinz, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Toggenburger, Truls H., von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Gramm, Werner, von Zürich, in Zuzwil SG, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Geschäftsführer mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 6813968, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Tobag Stiftung, in Winterthur, CH-020.7.904.761-1, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 37 vom 22.02.2011, S. 27, Publ. 6043364).
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht des Kantons Zürich (BVS) (CHE-239.560.630) [Eintrag von Amtes wegen auf Grund des Gesetzes über die BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht (BVSG) vom 11.07.2011]. [Gestrichene Angaben über die Organisation aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 95 HRegV.].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.