Reports for TMP Baumanagement AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout TMP Baumanagement AG
- TMP Baumanagement AG has its legal headquarters in Grenchen and is active. It operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities».
- TMP Baumanagement AG was founded on 18.11.1992.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 17.03.2023.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of SO under the UID CHE-101.513.283.
- Fotra Gastro- und Fest-Service GmbH, Fotra Gastronomie AG, Nabla Ingenieure GmbH have the same address as TMP Baumanagement AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.11.1992
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Grenchen
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-260.3.000.360-0
UID/VAT
CHE-101.513.283
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb eines Ingenieurbüros (insbesondere Bauherrenunterstützung und -beratung, Planung). Kann ferner Zweigniederlassungen errichten, alle Geschäfte tätigen, die geeignet sind, den Geschäftszweck zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen sowie für eigene Bedürfnisse auch Liegenschaften erwerben, belasten oder veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Villiger Treuhand AG | Biberist | 23.12.2002 | 18.08.2019 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- TMP Bauingenieure AG
- Theo Müller & Partner AG
- Müller Theo & Partner AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: TMP Baumanagement AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005703072, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
TMP Baumanagement AG, in Grenchen, CHE-101.513.283, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 158 vom 19.08.2019, Publ. 1004698176).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Veigl, Alexander Christian, von Wettingen, in Oberwil-Lieli, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Bassler, Axel Rainer, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Auggen (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004698176, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
TMP Bauingenieure AG, in Grenchen, CHE-101.513.283, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 132 vom 11.07.2019, Publ. 1004673428).
Statutenänderung:
23.07.2019.
Firma neu:
TMP Baumanagement AG.
Zweck neu:
Betrieb eines Ingenieurbüros (insbesondere Bauherrenunterstützung und -beratung, Planung). Kann ferner Zweigniederlassungen errichten, alle Geschäfte tätigen, die geeignet sind, den Geschäftszweck zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen sowie für eigene Bedürfnisse auch Liegenschaften erwerben, belasten oder veräussern. Mit Erklärung vom 23.07.2019 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Villiger Treuhand AG, in Biberist, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004673428, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
TMP Bauingenieure AG, in Grenchen, CHE-101.513.283, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 201 vom 17.10.2017, Publ. 3814313).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Jeanneret, Jean-Marc, von Le Locle, in Le Landeron, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wicki, Raymond, von Escholzmatt-Marbach, in Bern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bauer, Philippe, von Neuchâtel, in Milvignes, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Veigl, Alexander Christian, von Wettingen, in Oberwil-Lieli, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Meyer, André, von Muri (AG), in Lengnau (BE), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.