Address
c/o ETH Zürich, Thomas-Mann-Archiv
Rämistrasse 101
8092 Zürich ETH-Zentrum
Reports for Thomas Mann Gesellschaft
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Thomas Mann Gesellschaft
- Thomas Mann Gesellschaft has its legal headquarters in Zürich ETH-Zentrum, is active and operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The management has 5 active persons registered.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 27.09.2023.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of ZH is CHE-104.398.156.
- The address is identical with 4 other active companies. These include: Akademischer Motorsportverein Zürich (AMZ), Stiftung für die graphische Kunst in der Schweiz, Stiftung Solidaritätsfonds für ausländische Studierende in Zürich.
Management (5)
newest members of the committee
Angelina Maria Immoos,
Marc von Moos,
Ursula Amrein,
Arnaldo Benini,
Susanne Elisabeth Bernasconi-Aeppli
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.09.1996
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.6.000.293-1
UID/VAT
CHE-104.398.156
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Bezweckt, Verständnis für Thomas Mann zu vertiefen, Erforschung und Darstellung seines Werkes, seiner Person und seiner Zeit zu fördern und sein geistiges Erbe lebendig zu erhalten. Dies geschieht insbesondere durch literarische Veranstaltungen, Herausgabe und Förderung von Publikationen sowie durch Unterstützung des Thomas-Mann-Archivs der Eidgenössischen Technischen Hochschule Zürich.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Mann Thomas Gesellschaft
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Thomas Mann Gesellschaft
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005846453, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Thomas Mann Gesellschaft, in Zürich, CHE-104.398.156, Verein (SHAB Nr. 227 vom 22.11.2019, Publ. 1004765689).
Domizil neu:
c/o ETH Zürich, Thomas-Mann-Archiv, Rämistrasse 101, 8092 Zürich ETH-Zentrum.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bedenig Stein, Katrin, von Solothurn, in Zürich, Präsidentin des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Haller, Niklaus, von Zofingen, in Zürich, Mitglied des Vorstandes, Quästor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Papst, Manfred, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Greifensee, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Immoos, Angelina Maria, von Morschach, in Zürich, Mitglied des Vorstandes +Quästorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
von Moos, Marc, von Sachseln, in Fahrwangen, Präsident des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Publication number: HR02-1004765689, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Thomas Mann Gesellschaft, in Zürich, CHE-104.398.156, Verein (SHAB Nr. 97 vom 21.05.2012, S.0, Publ. 6685612).
Domizil neu:
c/o ETH Zürich, Thomas-Mann-Archiv, Leopold-Ruzicka-Weg 4, 8093 Zürich ETH-Hönggerberg.
Publication number: 6685612, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Thomas Mann Gesellschaft, in Zürich, CH-020.6.000.293-1, Verein (SHAB Nr. 14 vom 20.01.2012, S. 0, Publ. 6514326).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bedenig Stein, Katrin, von Solothurn, in Zürich, Präsidentin des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsidentin des Vorstandes mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Quästor];
Amrein, Ursula, von Luzern, in Zürich, Vizepräsidentin des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied des Vorstandes ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Haller, Niklaus, von Zofingen, in Zürich, Mitglied des Vorstandes und Quästor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Vorstandes und Quästor mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.