Address
Oberwilerstrasse 10
6062 Wilen (Sarnen)
Reports for Thinkpot GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Thinkpot GmbH
- Thinkpot GmbH has its legal headquarters in Wilen (Sarnen), is active and operates in the sector «IT services».
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 26.09.2011.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 16.01.2014. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Thinkpot GmbH is the following: CHE-142.722.453.
- The address is identical with 27 other active companies. These include: 8sources GmbH, Aare Sustainable Investments GmbH, All Nature Friends AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.09.2011
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Sarnen
Commercial Registry Office
OW
Commercial register number
CH-140.4.003.988-5
UID/VAT
CHE-142.722.453
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Entwicklung, Herstellung und den Import, Export und Handel von und mit Waren aller Art, vorwiegend aus den Bereichen EDV (Hard- und Software), HiFi-Systemen, Sportgeräten und Textilien sowie das Erbringen von Dienstleistungen aller Art in den erwähnten Bereichen. Nebenzwecke siehe Statuten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Thinkpot GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 1288907, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Thinkpot GmbH, in Sarnen, CHE-142.722.453, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 4 vom 08.01.2014, Publ. 1270177).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Koch, Peter, von Kriens, in Luzern, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wallrapp, Manuel, von Urdorf, in Ebikon, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 1270177, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Thinkpot GmbH, in Sarnen, CHE-142.722.453, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 184 vom 21.09.2012, Publ. 6858692).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wallrapp, Manuel, von Urdorf, in Ebikon, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00];
Koch, Peter, von Kriens, in Luzern, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift und mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00].
Publication number: 6858692, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Thinkpot GmbH, in Sarnen, CH-140.4.003.988-5, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 189 vom 29.09.2011, S. 0, Publ. 6354586).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wallrapp, Manuel, von Urdorf, in Ebikon, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift und mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00];
Koch, Peter, von Kriens, in Luzern, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.