Reports for the cogito foundation
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout the cogito foundation
- the cogito foundation has its legal headquarters in Wollerau, is active and operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The management of the organization the cogito foundation, which was founded on the 18.07.2001, consists of 4 persons.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 03.12.2021.
- The organization's UID is CHE-109.374.128.
Management (4)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Christof Aegerter,
Hubertina Wilmsen,
Prof. Dr. Michael Otmar Hengartner
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.07.2001
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Wollerau
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-130.7.001.108-5
UID/VAT
CHE-109.374.128
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Verständigung zwischen Vertretern der Exakten und Naturwissenschaften auf der einen Seite und den Geistes- und Sozialwissenschaften auf der anderen Seite zu verbessern und den Dialog zu fördern; besseres Verständnis für die Denkweise der Naturwissenschafter sowie die Bedeutung der naturwissenschaftlichen Grundlagenforschung in der Öffentlichkeit; um diese Ziele zu erreichen kann sie Forschungsprojekte durchführen, in Auftrag geben oder unterstützen; Stipendien an junge Forscher verleihen; Tagungen, Konferenzen, Seminarien und Workshops selbst durchführen oder unterstützen; Persönlichkeiten und Organisationen, die sich um die Ziele der Stiftung verdient gemacht haben, mit Preisen auszeichnen; Weiterbildungskurse anbieten; Publikationen herausgeben oder unterstützen, insbesondere auch in elektronischer Form; alle weiteren Massnahmen ergreifen, die dem Erreichen des Stiftungszwecks dienen; kann Grundeigentum erweben, verwalten und veräussern; sie ist international tätig.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Onestra AG | Hünenberg | <2004 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: the cogito foundation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005348555, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
the cogito foundation, in Wollerau, CHE-109.374.128, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 242 vom 13.12.2013, S.0, Publ. 1235955).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Aegerter, Dr. Irene, von Gurzelen und Zürich, in Wollerau, Vizepräsidentin, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Fischbacher, Dr. Urs, von Dietikon, in Dietikon, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Weder, Dr. Hans, von Diepoldsau, in Zürich, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 1235955, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
the cogito foundation, in Wollerau, CHE-109.374.128, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 164 vom 24.08.2012, Publ. 6821314).
Organisation neu:
[Gestrichene Angaben zur Organisation aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 95 Abs. 1 lit. h HRegV.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Aegerter, Dr. Simon, von Gurzelen, in Wollerau, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Behnisch, Dr. Urs, von Trub, in Solothurn, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fölmli Treuhand AG (CHE-106.841.211), in Hünenberg, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Fölmli Treuhand AG, in Rotkreuz];
Aegerter, Dr. Christof, von Gurzelen, in Rümikon, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Aegerter, Dr. Irene, von Gurzelen und Zürich, in Wollerau, Vizepräsidentin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Vizepräsidentin mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Fischbacher, Dr. Urs, von Dietikon, in Dietikon, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Wilmsen, Dr. Hubertina, niederländische Staatsangehörige, in Elsau, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 6821314, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
the cogito foundation, in Wollerau, CH-130.7.001.108-5, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 164 vom 25.08.2006, S. 12, Publ. 3521228).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wehner, Dr. Rüdiger, von Deutschland, in Zürich, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hengartner, Dr. Michael, von Muolen, in Zürich, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.