Branches (2)
Reports for TG Gasser AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout TG Gasser AG
- TG Gasser AG from Giswil operates in the sector «Production and processing of wooden goods» and is active.
- The company was founded on 19.08.2011 and has 4 persons in its management.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 02.02.2015. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company TG Gasser AG is the following: CHE-445.799.353.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Toni Gasser,
Michael Gasser,
Patrick Gasser,
Franziska Gasser
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.08.2011
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Giswil
Commercial Registry Office
OW
Commercial register number
CH-140.3.003.954-8
UID/VAT
CHE-445.799.353
Sector
Production and processing of wooden goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Planung, Gestaltung und Ausführung von Küchen und Möbeln sowie von Bau- und Möbelschreinerarbeiten jeder Art, wie Montage, Innenausbau, Renovation. An- und Verkauf von Möbeln und Handelsprodukten aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Immobilien erstellen und Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern, verwalten und sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann auch Zweigniederlassungen errichten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Sarnen | 02.02.2015 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Imfeld Consulting AG | Sarnen | 24.08.2011 | 01.02.2015 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: TG Gasser AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 1965105, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
TG Gasser AG, in Giswil, CHE-445.799.353, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 163 vom 24.08.2011, Publ. 6307146).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Imfeld Treuhand- und Revisions AG (CH-140.3.001.068-9), in Sarnen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
BDO AG (CHE-135.926.789), in Sarnen, Revisionsstelle.
Zweigniederlassung neu:
Lungern (CHE-466.271.201) [gestrichen: Lungern (CH-140.9.003.964-7)].Sarnen (CHE-167.207.575 [gestrichen: Sarnen (CH-140.9.003.953-6)].
Publication number: 6307146, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
TG Gasser AG, in Giswil, CH-140.3.003.954-8, Gorgenstrasse 3, 6074 Giswil, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
19.08.2011.
Zweck:
Planung, Gestaltung und Ausführung von Küchen und Möbeln sowie von Bau- und Möbelschreinerarbeiten jeder Art, wie Montage, Innenausbau, Renovation. An- und Verkauf von Möbeln und Handelsprodukten aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Immobilien erstellen und Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern, verwalten und sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann auch Zweigniederlassungen errichten.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände:
Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Gründung gemäss Sachübernahmevertrag vom 19.08.2011 von der TG Verwaltungs AG (vormals 'Toni Gasser AG'), in Giswil (CH-140.3.000.189-0) Aktiven von CHF 849'747.52 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 627'427.08.
Gegenleistung:
CHF 222'320.44, welche der Gesellschaft als Darlehen gewährt werden.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Brief an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt.
Eingetragene Personen:
Gasser, Toni, von Lungern, in Lungern, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Gasser, Michael, von Lungern, in Lungern, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Gasser, Patrick, von Lungern, in Sarnen, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Gasser, Franziska, von Lungern, in Lungern, mit Einzelprokura;
Imfeld Treuhand- und Revisions AG (CH-140.3.001.068-9), in Sarnen, Revisionsstelle.
Zweigniederlassung:
Lungern (CH-140.9.003.964-7). Sarnen (CH-140.9.003.953-6).
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.