Address
Via Lugano 3
6710 Biasca
Branches (1)
Reports for Tettamanti & Rodoni SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Tettamanti & Rodoni SA
- Tettamanti & Rodoni SA from Biasca operates in the sector «Other construction» and is active.
- The management of the company Tettamanti & Rodoni SA consists of 5 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 17.10.1974.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 20.09.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Tettamanti & Rodoni SA is the following: CHE-105.860.329.
Management (5)
newest board members
Roberto Basile,
Erik Muscetti,
Patrizia Adriana Brigida Tettamanti,
Roberta Dagani,
Simone Giuseppe Tettamanti
newest authorized signatories
Roberto Basile,
Erik Muscetti,
Patrizia Adriana Brigida Tettamanti,
Roberta Dagani,
Simone Giuseppe Tettamanti
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.10.1974
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Biasca
Commercial Registry Office
TI
Commercial register number
CH-528.3.000.705-2
UID/VAT
CHE-105.860.329
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language)
La progettazione ed esecuzione di impianti elettrici di qualsiasi tipo (corrente forte o debole) e di impianti telematici; la costruzione di quadri elettrici e elettropneumatici di ogni genere; l'esecuzione di opere edili, opere di finitura, impianti idro-termo-sanitari e climatizzazione; la partecipazione ad altre ditte del ramo.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Amco Fiduciaria SA | Faido | 30.07.2014 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
R.M.S. Fiduciaria SA | Lugano | 03.06.2010 | 29.07.2014 | |
Ufficio fiduciario e contabile di Pierangelo Gadoni | Bellinzona | 28.10.2005 | 02.06.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Tettamanti & Rodoni General Contractor SA
- Tettamanti e Rodoni SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Tettamanti & Rodoni SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005841983, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Tettamanti & Rodoni SA, in Biasca, CHE-105.860.329, società anonima (Nr. FUSC 62 del 29.03.2023, Pubbl. 1005712397).
Persone dimissionarie e firme cancellate:
Tettamanti, Gianfranco Pietro, da Mendrisio, in Biasca, presidente, con firma individuale.
Nuove persone iscritte o modifiche:
Basile, Roberto, da Biasca, in Biasca, presidente, con firma individuale [finora: vice-presidente, con firma individuale].
Publication number: HR02-1005712397, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Tettamanti & Rodoni SA, in Biasca, CHE-105.860.329, società anonima (Nr. FUSC 40 del 27.02.2023, Pubbl. 1005688358).
Nuovo recapito:
Via Lugano 3, 6710 Biasca.
Publication number: HR02-1005688358, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Tettamanti & Rodoni SA, in Biasca, CHE-105.860.329, società anonima (Nr. FUSC 229 del 24.11.2020, Pubbl. 1005030563).
Nuove persone iscritte o modifiche:
Basile, Roberto, da Biasca, in Biasca, vice-presidente, con firma individuale;
Tettamanti, Simone Giuseppe, da Mendrisio, in Lugano, membro, con firma individuale [finora: membro, con firma collettiva a due];
Dagani, Roberta, da Onsernone, in Biasca, membro, con firma collettiva a due;
Muscetti, Erik, cittadino italiano, in Biasca, membro, con firma collettiva a due;
Tettamanti, Patrizia Adriana Brigida, da Mendrisio, in Biasca, membro, con firma collettiva a due.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.