Reports for Tertianum Management AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Tertianum Management AG
- Tertianum Management AG is currently active and the industry «Business management and administration». The legal headquarters are in Dübendorf.
- The management consists of 6 persons. The company was founded on 18.03.2016.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 28.05.2024.
- The company's UID is CHE-306.129.036.
- There are 13 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: All Out Golf GmbH, Clickwise KlG, Furger und Partner AG Strategieentwicklung.
Management (6)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Barbara Schuler,
Stefan Ralf Knabl,
Tanja Désirée Hilber,
Dr. med. Ryan Aryono Tandjung,
Nicolas Félix Crognaletti
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.03.2016
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Dübendorf
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.043.103-3
UID/VAT
CHE-306.129.036
CHE-255.364.990 VAT
Sector
Business management and administration
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen für die Tertianum Unternehmensgruppe und Dritte, namentlich in den Bereichen Unternehmenssteuerung, -entwicklung und -projektierung, Finanz- und Rechnungswesen, Controlling, Zahlungsverkehr, Risiko und Qualitätsmanagement, Personaladministration und -entwicklung, Marketing, Kommunikation und Recht. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten und erwerben und sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen und Rechtshandlungen vornehmen, die bestimmt oder geeignet sind, die Unternehmensgruppe zu steuern und zu entwickeln, den Gesellschaftszweck zu fördern oder diesen zu erleichtern. Die Gesellschaft kann auch an Konzernfinanzierungen teilnehmen, namentlich indem sie ihren direkten oder indirekten Gesellschaftern oder anderen Konzerngesellschaften Kredite gewährt oder für deren Verbindlichkeiten gegenüber Dritten Garantien oder andere Sicherheiten aller Art gewährt.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Zürich | 23.03.2016 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Tertianum Management AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006041076, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Tertianum Management AG, in Dübendorf, CHE-306.129.036, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 199 vom 13.10.2023, Publ. 1005859774).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sutter-Della Valle, Sandro Olivier, von Ebnat-Kappel, in Baar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005859774, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Tertianum Management AG, in Dübendorf, CHE-306.129.036, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 104 vom 01.06.2023, Publ. 1005757667).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stäger, Luca, von Merenschwand, in Einsiedeln, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Zürich].
Publication number: HR02-1005757667, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 70 vom 12.04.2023 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 14624 vom 05.04.2023 Tertianum Management AG, in Dübendorf, CHE-306.129.036, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 70 vom 12.04.2023, Publ. 1005721321). Herr Sutter- Della Valle, Sandro Olivier, von Ebnat-Kappel, in Baar, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, wurde mit dem Eintrag im Tagesregister 14624 vom 05.04.2023 und SHAB 70 vom 12.04.2023 irrtümlich gelöscht statt mutiert.
Neu:
Sutter- Della Valle, Sandro Olivier, von Ebnat-Kappel, in Baar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien (bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sutter-Della Valle, Sandro Olivier, von Ebnat-Kappel, in Baar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.