Address
c/o Gemeindekanzlei
Gass 15
8226 Schleitheim
Reports for TENGER-STIFTUNG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout TENGER-STIFTUNG
- TENGER-STIFTUNG has its legal headquarters in Schleitheim and is active. It operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- TENGER-STIFTUNG was founded on 26.09.2006.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 22.12.2017.
- In the commercial register the organization TENGER-STIFTUNG is registered under the UID CHE-113.184.163.
- Companies with the same address as TENGER-STIFTUNG: Erzinger-Peyer-Stiftung, Leonhard Erzinger-Stiftung.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Gabriela Irene Uehlinger,
Bruno Schmid,
Karin Riederer-Benker,
Petra Nicole Bachmann,
Jakob Vögeli
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.09.2006
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Schleitheim
Commercial Registry Office
SH
Commercial register number
CH-290.7.015.576-4
UID/VAT
CHE-113.184.163
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Errichtung, Aufwertung und Pflege eines oder mehrerer grosser Naturschutzgebiete im Kanton Schaffhausen, die Wald, Wiese und Wasser enthalten können und noch wenig unter Zivilisationseinflüssen (Überbauung, Verstrassung u.ä.) gelitten haben.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BMO Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Neuhausen am Rheinfall | 28.01.2011 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: TENGER-STIFTUNG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3952019, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
TENGER-STIFTUNG, in Schleitheim, CHE-113.184.163, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 172 vom 06.09.2017, Publ. 3736655).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Uehlinger, Gabriela Irene, von Neunkirch, in Neunkirch, Vizepräsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Publication number: 3736655, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
TENGER-STIFTUNG, in Schleitheim, CHE-113.184.163, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 231 vom 28.11.2016, Publ. 3187243).
Weitere Adressen:
[gestrichen: Dr. Herbert Billing, Beckenstube 11, 8200 Schaffhausen].
Weitere Adresse:
Bruno Schmid, Beckenstube 11, 8200 Schaffhausen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Billing, Dr. Herbert, von Flurlingen, in Schaffhausen, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Unterschrift zu zweien;
Tenger, Samuel Hartwig, von Schleitheim, in Kirchdorf BE, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Hafner, Christoph Heinrich, von Holderbank (SO), in Schleitheim, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmid, Bruno, von Ramsen, in Schaffhausen, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Unterschrift zu zweien];
Vögeli, Jakob, von Gächlingen, in Schaffhausen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Riederer-Benker, Karin, von Pfäfers, in Schleitheim, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Bachmann, Petra Nicole, von Schwarzenberg, in Siblingen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 3187243, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
TENGER-STIFTUNG, in Schleitheim, CHE-113.184.163, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 81 vom 27.04.2016, Publ. 2803141).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
BMO Wirtschaftsprüfung AG (CHE-100.786.275), in Neuhausen am Rheinfall, Revisionsstelle [bisher: BMO Revision AG (290.3.001.467) (RAB 500'043)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.