Reports for Tellco pkFLEX in Liquidation
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Tellco pkFLEX in Liquidation
- Tellco pkFLEX in Liquidation has its legal headquarters in Schwyz, is in liquidation and operates in the sector «Operation of an pension fund».
- The organization was founded on 06.06.2006 and has 13 persons in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 30.04.2024.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of SZ is CHE-112.966.163.
- There are 11 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Appia Treuhand AG, Auto AG Schwyz, Stiftung Sonnenschein.
Management (13)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Daniel Greber,
Dr. Paul Robert Peyrot,
Tobias Baumann,
lic. iur. Thomas Friedrich Kopp
newest authorized signatories
Daniel Greber,
Dr. Paul Robert Peyrot,
Tobias Baumann,
lic. iur. Thomas Friedrich Kopp,
Nadja Kopp
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.06.2006
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Schwyz
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-130.7.011.386-6
UID/VAT
CHE-112.966.163
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt die Durchführung der obligatorischen beruflichen Vorsorge für Arbeitnehmer und Arbeitgeber der angeschlossenen Arbeitgeber sowie für deren Angehörige und Hinterlassenen gegen die wirtschaftlichen Folgen von Alter, Tod und Invalidität.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Basel | 29.01.2024 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Basel | 18.11.2008 | 28.01.2024 | |
Honegger Treuhand AG | Freienbach | 12.06.2006 | 17.11.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Tellco pkFLEX
- Tellco Pensinvest
- stiftung private pro
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Tellco pkFLEX in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: LS05-0000003641, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz
Rubrik: Liquidationsschuldenrufe Unterrubrik: Liquidationsschuldenruf einer Stiftung Publikationsdatum: SHAB 30.04.2024 Öffentlich einsehbar bis: 30.04.2029 Meldungsnummer: Liquidationsschuldenruf Tellco pkFLEX in Liquidation Organisation in Aufhebung: Tellco pkFLEX in Liquidation CHE-112.966.163 Bahnhofstrasse 4
Kontaktstelle: Tellco pkFLEX in Liquidation, Bahnhofstrasse 4,
Publication number: HR02-1005946227, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Tellco pkFLEX in Liquidation, in Schwyz, CHE-112.966.163, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 198 vom 12.10.2023, Publ. 1005858905).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ernst & Young AG (CHE-105.932.265), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG (CHE-393.441.652), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005858905, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Tellco pkFLEX, in Schwyz, CHE-112.966.163, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 137 vom 18.07.2022, Publ. 1005522912).
Name neu:
Tellco pkFLEX in Liquidation. Die Stiftung ist gemäss Verfügung der Zentralschweizer BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht (ZBSA) vom 12.07.2023 aufgehoben.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Baumann, Tobias, von Mülligen, in Oberentfelden, Mitglied und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Greber, Daniel, von Reichenbach im Kandertal, in Kreuzlingen, Mitglied und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Kopp, Thomas, von Luzern, in Luzern, Präsident und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Luzern und Ebikon, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Peyrot, Paul, von Wartau, in Aeugst am Albis, Mitglied und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.