Address
c/o Ville du Locle, service des finances
Avenue du Technicum 21
2400 Le Locle
Reports for Téléski Le Locle-Sommartel SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Téléski Le Locle-Sommartel SA
- Téléski Le Locle-Sommartel SA from Le Locle operates in the sector «Transportation of passenger and freight by road» and is active.
- The company was founded on 09.09.1966 and has 5 persons in its management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 08.12.2023.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Téléski Le Locle-Sommartel SA is the following: CHE-108.790.754.
Management (5)
newest board members
Anthony von Allmen,
Michaël Berly,
Jean-Daniel Schindelholz,
Cédric Michel Dupraz,
Michel-Gilbert-Emile Gremaud
newest authorized signatories
Anthony von Allmen,
Michaël Berly,
Jean-Daniel Schindelholz,
Cédric Michel Dupraz,
Michel-Gilbert-Emile Gremaud
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.09.1966
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Le Locle
Commercial Registry Office
NE
Commercial register number
CH-645.1.008.234-2
UID/VAT
CHE-108.790.754
Sector
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Construction et exploitation d'un téléski reliant la Combe-Jeanneret à Sommartel ainsi que le développement de la pratique du ski dans la région du Locle.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Vigilis SA | La Chaux-de-Fonds | 30.01.2018 | 19.05.2020 | |
Rolf Graber, Fiduciaire-Gérance | Le Locle | 24.01.2013 | 29.01.2018 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Téléski Le Locle-Sommartel SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005905627, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Téléski Le Locle-Sommartel S.A., Le Locle, CHE-108.790.754 (FOSC du 20.05.2020, p. 0/1004894103). de la Reussille Denis, jusqu'ici président, et Dubois Claude Henri, jusqu'ici secrétaire, ne sont plus membres du conseil d'administration;
leurs pouvoirs sont radiés. Berly Michaël, de Luzern, à Le Locle, président, et von Allmen Anthony, de La Chaux-de-Fonds, à Le Locle, secrétaire, sont membres du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1004894103, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Téléski Le Locle-Sommartel S.A., Le Locle, CHE-108.790.754 (FOSC du 30.01.2018, p. 0/4024305). Les 500 actions de CHF 100, nominatives, sont désormais liées selon statuts.
Capital-actions:
CHF 50'000, entièrement libéré, divisé en 500 actions de CHF 100, nominatives, liées selon statuts. Statuts modifiés le 10.12.2019. "Société Fiduciaire Vigilis S.A." CHE-102.360.639) n'est plus organe de révision. Selon déclaration du 28.04.2020, la société n'est pas soumise à un contrôle ordinaire et a renoncé à un contrôle restreint.
Publication number: 4024305, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Téléski Le Locle-Sommartel S.A., Le Locle, CHE-108.790.754 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225830). Häsler Charles-Eric et Jean-Mairet Patricia ne sont plus membres du conseil d'administration;
leurs pouvoirs sont radiés. Dubois Claude Henri, de et à Le Locle, est membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux. Schindelholz Jean-Daniel, de Marbach (LU), à Le Locle, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux avec le président ou le secrétaire. 'Rolf Graber, Fiduciaire-Gérance' (CH-645.1.000.941-4) n'est plus organe de révision.
Organe de révision:
'Société Fiduciaire Vigilis S.A.' CHE-102.360.639), à La chaux-de-Fonds.
Nouvelle adresse:
avenue du Technicum 21, c/o Ville du Locle, service des finances, 2400 Le Locle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.