Address
Route de Chandolan 1
1752 Villars-sur-Glâne
Branches (5)
Reports for Telecom Services SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Telecom Services SA
- Telecom Services SA from Villars-sur-Glâne operates in the sector «IT services» and is active.
- The management consists of 8 persons. The company was founded on 01.09.2003.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 23.09.2024.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of FR under the UID CHE-110.198.536.
Management (8)
newest board members
Dr. Mario Paul Magada,
Dr. David Voltz,
Jean-Noël Eric Jaton,
Philippe Robert Bersier,
Jean-Paul Holenstein
newest authorized signatories
Frank Gérard Frédéric Roger,
Patrick Guisolan,
Dr. Mario Paul Magada,
Dr. David Voltz,
Jean-Noël Eric Jaton
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.09.2003
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Villars-sur-Glâne
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.1.002.470-3
UID/VAT
CHE-110.198.536
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Etude, exécution de toutes prestations et activités en relation avec la télématique, l'informatique, les télécommunications, les moyens de transmission avec ou sans fils, l'intégration de la téléphonie et de l'informatique, les services de maintenance sur sites ou/et à distance, le commerce de toutes marchandises ou matières, notamment dans le secteur des télécommunications.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Lambelet Société Anonyme Fidal | Lausanne | 14.03.2022 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduconseils SA | Estavayer | 05.09.2003 | 13.03.2022 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Telecom Services SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006135540, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg
Telecom Services SA, à Villars-sur-Glâne, CHE-110.198.536 (FOSC du 15.03.2024, p. 0/1005986706).
Personne inscrite modifiée:
Fernandes Petronilho Meyer Mario Jorge, signature collective à deux, avec le président ou le secrétaire, maintenant signature collective à deux, avec un administrateur, désormais avec le nom de Meyer Mario, de Val-de-Charmey, à La Roche.
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
Grajcevci Emin, de Bercher, à Gibloux, signature collective à deux, avec un administrateur.
Publication number: HR02-1005986706, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Telecom Services SA, à Villars-sur-Glâne, CHE-110.198.536 (FOSC du 29.01.2024, p. 0/1005946368).
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
Roger Frank Gérard Frédéric, de France, à Nyon, signature collective à deux avec un administrateur.
Publication number: HR02-1005946368, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Telecom Services SA, à Villars-sur-Glâne, CHE-110.198.536 (SHAB vom 08.01.2024, s. 0/1005927561).
Personne radiée:
Florio Pascal Jean, signature collective à deux, avec le président ou le secrétaire.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.