Address
c/o Profectus Sàrl
Rue de Saint-Guérin 30
1950 Sion
Reports for Tekplan Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Tekplan Sàrl
- Tekplan Sàrl has its legal headquarters in Sion, is active and operates in the sector «Interior design and decoration».
- Tekplan Sàrl has one person entered in its management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 14.08.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Tekplan Sàrl is the following: CHE-413.142.806.
- There are 14 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Agence Valaisanne de Communication SA, BAY Invest Sàrl, CBI Promotion SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.12.2020
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Sion
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.193.575-2
UID/VAT
CHE-413.142.806
Sector
Interior design and decoration
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La pose, l'habillage décoratif et la prise de mesures et de métrés de plans de travail, ainsi que tous types de petits travaux de rénovation et d'améliorations d'intérieurs; l'achat, la vente, la promotion, la commercialisation, ainsi que l'import et l'export de meubles de cuisine, d'armoires, de salles de bain, de dressings, d'appareils électroménagers et autres mobiliers; la gestion et le suivi de projets financiers et immobiliers, l'achat, la vente et la location de biens immobiliers en Suisse et à l'étranger, à l'exclusion toutefois des opérations prohibées par la loi fédérale du 16 décembre 1983 sur l'acquisition d'immeubles par des personnes à l'étranger (LFAIE) (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Tekplan Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006106708, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Tekplan Sàrl, à Sion, CHE-413.142.806, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 147 du 02.08.2022, Publ. 1005533502).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Gojard, Camille Lucien, ressortissant français, à Nyon, associé et gérant, avec signature collective à deux, pour 102 parts sociales de CHF 100.00;
Javoy, Philippe, ressortissant français, à Gex (FR), associé et gérant, avec signature collective à deux, pour 4 parts sociales de CHF 100.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Waser, Loric, de Lucens, à Saint-Livres, associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 200 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: associé et président des gérants, avec signature collective à deux, pour 94 parts sociales de CHF 100.00].
Publication number: HR02-1005533502, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Tekplan Sàrl, à Sion, CHE-413.142.806, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 8 du 12.01.2022, Publ. 1005379576).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Charlet, Nicolas, ressortissant français, à Nyon, associé et gérant, avec signature collective à deux, pour 102 parts sociales de CHF 100.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Waser, Loric, de Lucens, à Saint-Livres, associé et président des gérants, avec signature collective à deux, pour 94 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: associé et président des gérants, avec signature collective à deux avec Charlet Nicolas];
Gojard, Camille Lucien, ressortissant français, à Nyon, associé et gérant, avec signature collective à deux, pour 102 parts sociales de CHF 100.00;
Javoy, Philippe, ressortissant français, à Gex (FR), associé et gérant, avec signature collective à deux, pour 4 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: associé et gérant, avec signature collective à deux avec Charlet Nicolas].
Publication number: HR02-1005379576, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Tekplan Sàrl, précédemment à Saint-Livres, CHE-413.142.806, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 240 du 09.12.2020).
Modification des statuts:
13.10.2021.
Nouveau siège:
Sion.
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o Profectus Sàrl, Rue de St-Guérin 30, 1950 Sion.
Autres adresses:
c/o Loric Waser, Rue des Artisans 10, 1176 St-Livres.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.