Reports for Teilinger Investments SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Teilinger Investments SA
- Teilinger Investments SA has its legal headquarters in Genève and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Operation of other financial institutions».
- The management of the company Teilinger Investments SA consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 18.04.2011.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 17.06.2024.
- The company is registered in the commercial register GE under the UID CHE-160.936.124.
- Companies with an identical address: Arkham SA, Atlantank SA, Capital Group Companies Global, Los Angeles, Geneva branch.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.04.2011
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Genève
Commercial Registry Office
GE
Commercial register number
CH-660.1.166.011-5
UID/VAT
CHE-160.936.124
CHE-116.346.864 VAT
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La détention, l'investissement, l'achat, la vente et le financement de titres, papiers-valeurs, actions et instruments dérivés à l'exclusion de ceux, le cas échéant, de sociétés détenant des biens immobiliers de nature résidentielle en Suisse; la société peut exercer ses activités dans le monde entier, pour son propre compte ou en association avec des tiers; la société peut effectuer toutes opérations financières, commerciales et industrielles et fournir des services administratifs et autres, en Suisse et à l'étranger, se rattachant directement ou indirectement à son but; cependant, la société n'acquerra aucun immeuble en Suisse, à l'exception, le cas échéant, d'immeubles à usage exclusivement commercial; la société peut constituer des succursales et des filiales en Suisse et à l'étranger et acquérir des participations dans d'autres sociétés en Suisse ou à l'étranger (mais pour celles ayant, le cas échéant, une activité immobilière en Suisse, exclusivement les sociétés se limitant à l'acquisition d'immeubles à affectation commerciale); la société peut également participer au financement, notamment par la fourniture de prêts, garanties et de sûretés de tout type, à d'autres entités du groupe auquel la société appartient, dans l'intérêt dudit groupe.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young SA | Lancy | 05.09.2023 | 16.06.2024 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Teilinger Investments Ltd
- Teilinger Investments AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Teilinger Investments SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006059154, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Teilinger Investments SA, à Genève, CHE-160.936.124 (FOSC du 05.09.2023, p. 0/1005831567). Selon déclaration du 05.06.2024, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint. Ernst & Young SA (CHE-186.791.979) n'est plus organe de révision.
Publication number: HR02-1005831567, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Teilinger Investments SA, à Genève, CHE-160.936.124 (FOSC du 06.07.2022, p. 0/1005514676). Radiation de la mention relative à la renonciation à un contôle restreint.
Organe de révision:
Ernst & Young SA (CHE-186.791.979), succursale à Lancy.
Publication number: HR02-1005514676, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Teilinger Investments SA, à Genève, CHE-160.936.124 (FOSC du 20.04.2021, p. 0/1005154554). Duncan Scott James n'est plus administrateur;
ses pouvoirs sont radiés. L'administrateur Abbott Robert, président, continue à signer individuellement. Siger Raphaël, de Hindelbank, à Genève, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature individuelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.