Reports for TechnoArk SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout TechnoArk SA
- TechnoArk SA has its legal headquarters in Sierre and is active. It operates in the sector «Services regarding management consulting».
- The management of the company TechnoArk SA consists of 6 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 15.07.2021.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of VS under the UID CHE-113.380.741.
- On the same address there are 17 other active companies registered. These include: ALEPH Sàrl, Destinazio Sàrl, E.T.D. SA.
Management (6)
newest board members
Dr. Jean-Albert Emile Ferrez,
Olivier Salamin,
Pierre Joseph Berthod,
Daniel André Antille,
Nicolas Guillaume Melly
newest authorized signatories
Pierre Joseph Berthod,
Nicolas Guillaume Melly,
Laurent Borella
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.01.2007
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sierre
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.3.010.784-0
UID/VAT
CHE-113.380.741
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Jouer un rôle actif de promotion du développement économique de la ville de Sierre et de la région de Sierre; la société a pour mission de mettre à disposition un environnement favorable à toutes les entreprises et organisations, en particulier celles oeuvrant dans le domaine de l'application des Technologies de l'Information et de la communication (TIC); la société peut acquérir ou vendre des immeubles et entreprendre toutes activités convergentes.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Vincent Epiney Sàrl | Sierre | 24.02.2020 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire FIDAG SA | Martigny | 26.04.2012 | 23.02.2020 | |
Bureau Fiduciaire Berthod, Gaspoz & Salamin SA | Sierre | 23.01.2007 | 25.04.2012 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: TechnoArk SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005250505, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
TechnoArk SA, à Sierre, CHE-113.380.741, société anonyme (No. FOSC 37 du 24.02.2020, Publ. 1004837650).
Nouvelle adresse:
Technopôle 10, 3960 Sierre.
Publication number: HR02-1004837650, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
TechnoArk SA, à Sierre, CHE-113.380.741, société anonyme (No. FOSC 134 du 13.07.2018, Publ. 4358367).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Fiduciaire Fidag SA (CH-621.3.000.423-4), à Martigny, organe de révision.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Fiduciaire Vincent Epiney Sàrl (CHE-187.681.885), à Sierre, organe de révision.
Publication number: 4358367, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
TechnoArk SA, à Sierre, CHE-113.380.741, société anonyme (No. FOSC 117 du 20.06.2018, Publ. 4303163).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Seppey, François, de Hérémence, à Salins (Sion), administrateur, sans droit de signature.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Ferrez, Jean Albert Emile, de Bagnes, à Bagnes, administrateur, sans droit de signature.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.