Reports for Tecfrut AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Tecfrut AG
- Tecfrut AG is active in the industry «Trading with machines» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Au ZH.
- The management of the company Tecfrut AG consists of 4 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 27.04.2020.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of ZH is CHE-108.667.088.
- Araris Biotech AG, Elektron AG, Fürsorgestiftung der Elektron AG are registered at the same address.
Management (4)
newest board members
Thomas Wolewinski,
Dr. Marc André Zulauf,
Markus Alfons Senn,
Peter Joachim Steinmann
newest authorized signatories
Thomas Wolewinski,
Dr. Marc André Zulauf,
Markus Alfons Senn,
Peter Joachim Steinmann
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.09.1997
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Wädenswil
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.020.038-1
UID/VAT
CHE-108.667.088
Sector
Trading with machines
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt Grosshandel, Handel, Fabrikation und Montage von elektronischen und mechanischen Geräten und Maschinen, Entwicklung von neuen Produkten, Verwertung von Patenten sowie Beratungen auf diesen Gebieten, kann Liegenschaften kaufen, verwalten und verkaufen, sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, usw. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Meienberg Treuhand GmbH | Zürich | 25.11.2008 | 20.02.2014 | |
Gareva Revisions AG | Zürich | <2004 | 24.11.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Tecfrut AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004877276, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 73 vom 16.04.2020 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 14414 vom 09.04.2020 Tecfrut AG, in Wädenswil, CHE-108.667.088, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 73 vom 16.04.2020, Publ. 1004871646).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Senn, Markus Alfons, von Füllinsdorf, in Affoltern am Albis, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [nicht: in Knonau];
Zulauf, Marc André, von Schinznach, in Knonau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [nicht: in Affoltern am Albis].
Publication number: HR02-1004871646, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Tecfrut AG, in Wädenswil, CHE-108.667.088, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 103 vom 29.05.2019, Publ. 1004640454).
Domizil neu:
Riedhofstrasse 11, 8804 Au ZH.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Steinmann-Gysel, Ursula, von St. Gallen und Küsnacht ZH, in Wädenswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Buob, Stephan Robert, von Rorschacherberg, in Lausanne, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Buob, Konrad Robert, von Rorschacherberg, in Köniz, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Thomas, Wolewinski, von Frenkendorf, in Pfäffikon, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Senn, Markus Alfons, von Füllinsdorf, in Knonau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Steinmann, Peter Joachim, von St. Gallen und Küsnacht (ZH), in Richterswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Zulauf, Marc André, von Schinznach, in Affoltern am Albis, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004640454, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Tecfrut AG, in Wädenswil, CHE-108.667.088, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 36 vom 21.02.2014, S.0, Publ. 1359433).
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der Puricelli + Keller, Industrie-Ingenieure AG, in Wädenswil (CHE-101.972.627), gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 23.05.2019 und Bilanz per 31.12.2018. Aktiven von CHF 948'875.53 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 457'571.53 gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Da die übernehmende Gesellschaft sämtliche Aktien der übertragenden Gesellschaft hält, findet weder eine Kapitalerhöhung noch eine Aktienzuteilung statt.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.