Reports for TECA-PRINT AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout TECA-PRINT AG
- TECA-PRINT AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Thayngen. TECA-PRINT AG belongs to the industry «Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 13.10.1977 and has 4 persons in its management.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 23.06.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is CHE-105.978.729.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Ronny Markus Eichelhardt,
Melanie Dräger,
Daniel Eddie Fahl,
Jean-Louis Dubuit
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.10.1977
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Thayngen
Commercial Registry Office
SH
Commercial register number
CH-290.3.004.342-7
UID/VAT
CHE-105.978.729
Sector
Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Fabrikation von und den Handel mit Maschinen und Anlagen aller Art, insbesondere auf den Gebieten Tampon-Druck und Automatisation. Die Gesellschaft ist berechtigt, alle Geschäfte zu tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit diesem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen die geeignet sind, ihn zu fördern. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten und sich an Unternehmungen mit gleichen oder ähnlichen Zwecken beteiligen. Sie kann ferner Liegenschaften erwerben, veräussern und verwalten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire FIDAG SA, succursale de Crans-Montana | Lens | 17.06.2002 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- TECA-PRINT SA
- Teca-Print AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: TECA-PRINT AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005776643, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
TECA-PRINT AG, in Thayngen, CHE-105.978.729, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 81 vom 27.04.2022, Publ. 1005459633).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kälin, Rudolf Onorato, von Einsiedeln, in Seuzach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Eichelhardt, Ronny Markus, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Emmingen-Liptingen (DE), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005459633, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
TECA-PRINT AG, in Thayngen, CHE-105.978.729, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 155 vom 12.08.2021, Publ. 1005269727).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dräger, Melanie, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Ühlingen-Birkendorf (DE), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005269727, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
TECA-PRINT AG, in Thayngen, CHE-105.978.729, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 108 vom 08.06.2021, Publ. 1005210003).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lindner, Aleksandra, von Steckborn, in Steckborn, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kälin, Rudolf Onorato, von Einsiedeln, in Seuzach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Küsnacht ZH].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.