Reports for TDC Technisches Dienstleistungscenter AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout TDC Technisches Dienstleistungscenter AG
- TDC Technisches Dienstleistungscenter AG has its legal headquarters in Thalwil and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Technical, physical and chemical testing».
- The company was founded on 27.01.2000.
- On the 23.01.2023 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register ZH under the UID CHE-105.390.648.
- The address is identical with 7 other active companies. These include: Barney & Baxter AG, Käthe Wohlfahrt Schweiz AG, LINAK AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.01.2000
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Thalwil
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-130.0.011.011-3
UID/VAT
CHE-105.390.648
Sector
Technical, physical and chemical testing
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb und die Führung eines technischen Sachverständigenbüros sowie das Erbringen aller damit zusammenhängenden Dienstleistungen und Tätigkeiten. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen, ferner Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen oder sich mit diesen zusammenschliessen. Sie kann auch Liegenschaften erwerben, belasten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Vescofida Wirtschaftsprüfungs GmbH | Niederhasli | 23.01.2023 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Monika Schrott Treuhand GmbH | Thalwil | 08.10.2014 | 22.01.2023 | |
prosper ag treuhand & beratung | Zug | 03.04.2013 | 07.10.2014 | |
Budliger Treuhand AG | Zürich | <2004 | 13.07.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- TDC Technisches Dienstleistungszenter AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: TDC Technisches Dienstleistungscenter AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005658478, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
TDC Technisches Dienstleistungscenter AG, in Thalwil, CHE-105.390.648, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 90 vom 11.05.2020, Publ. 1004886307).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Monika Schrott Treuhand GmbH (CHE-487.635.390), in Thalwil, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Vescofida Wirtschaftsprüfungs GmbH (CHE-100.956.844), in Niederhasli, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004886307, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
TDC Technisches Dienstleistungscenter AG, in Thalwil, CHE-105.390.648, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 194 vom 08.10.2014, S.0, Publ. 1756503).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stocker, Manfred, von Freienbach, in Freienbach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Seiler, Kurt, von Zürich und Bönigen, in Uitikon, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Zürich].
Publication number: 1756503, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
TDC Technisches Dienstleistungscenter AG, in Thalwil, CHE-105.390.648, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 63 vom 03.04.2013, Publ. 7129424).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
prosper ag treuhand & beratung (CH-170.3.032.343-2), in Zug, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Monika Schrott Treuhand GmbH (CHE-487.635.390), in Thalwil, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.