Reports for LINAK AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout LINAK AG
- LINAK AG has its legal headquarters in Thalwil and is active. It operates in the sector «Manufacturing of other electrical equipment/appliances».
- The management of the company LINAK AG, which was founded on the 28.06.2002, consists of 2 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 12.10.2022.
- The reported UID is CHE-109.634.430.
- On the same address there are 7 other active companies registered. These include: Barney & Baxter AG, Käthe Wohlfahrt Schweiz AG, Max Trade Service AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.06.2002
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Thalwil
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.025.947-3
UID/VAT
CHE-109.634.430
Sector
Manufacturing of other electrical equipment/appliances
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Entwicklung, Herstellung, Verkauf und Wartung von technischen Geräten, insbesondere für Spitäler, Pflege und Rehabilitation, Büro, Industrie etc. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
D & G Wirtschaftsprüfer AG in Liquidation | Zürich | 08.06.2004 | 18.05.2009 | |
ggm Wirtschaftsprüfungs AG | Küsnacht (ZH) | <2004 | 07.06.2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- LINAK Ltd
- LINAK SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: LINAK AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005581186, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
LINAK AG, in Thalwil, CHE-109.634.430, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 16.07.2021, Publ. 1005250768).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schrott, Monika, von Zürich, in Birmensdorf (ZH), mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sobol, Jörgen, dänischer Staatsangehöriger, in St. Gallen, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Augustenborg (DK)].
Publication number: HR02-1005250768, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
LINAK AG, in Thalwil, CHE-109.634.430, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 187 vom 27.09.2019, Publ. 1004725163).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Patera, Livio, von Thalwil, in Jonen, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sobol, Jörgen, dänischer Staatsangehöriger, in Augustenborg (DK), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Schrott, Monika, von Zürich, in Birmensdorf (ZH), mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004725163, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
LINAK AG, in Thalwil, CHE-109.634.430, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 170 vom 04.09.2017, Publ. 3730071).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jensen, Bent, dänischer Staatsangehöriger, in Nordborg Sogn (DK), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Patera, Livio, von Thalwil, in Jonen, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.