Reports for Taverne de la Tour du Bouveret Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Taverne de la Tour du Bouveret Sàrl
- Taverne de la Tour du Bouveret Sàrl with its legal headquarters in Bouveret is a Limited liability company from the sector «Operation of restaurants». Taverne de la Tour du Bouveret Sàrl is active.
- The management of the company Taverne de la Tour du Bouveret Sàrl, which was founded on the 09.10.2017, consists of one person.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 09.11.2022.
- Taverne de la Tour du Bouveret Sàrl is registered in the Canton of VS under the UID CHE-199.273.725.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.10.2017
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Port-Valais
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.4.010.022-1
UID/VAT
CHE-199.273.725
Sector
Operation of restaurants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploiter tout établissement public (notamment café, restaurant, bar), exercer toute activité commerciale ou de service dans les domaines de la restauration, du service traiteur ou de la distribution et achat de tous biens; la société peut notamment accorder des prêts ou des garanties à des associés ou des tiers, si cela favorise ses intérêts (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Taverne de la Tour du Bouveret Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005600833, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Taverne de la Tour du Bouveret Sàrl, à Port-Valais, CHE-199.273.725, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 166 du 29.08.2019, Publ. 1004705557).
Nouvelle adresse:
Rue du Lac 5, 1897 Bouveret.
Publication number: HR02-1004705557, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Taverne de la Tour du Bouveret Sàrl, à Port-Valais, CHE-199.273.725, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 198 du 12.10.2017, Publ. 3807151).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Palmisano, Stefanie, de Sainte-Croix, à Port-Valais, associée et gérante, avec signature individuelle, pour 150 parts sociales de CHF 100.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Palmisano, Luca, de Sainte-Croix, à Port-Valais, associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 200 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: associé, sans droit de signature, pour 50 parts sociales de CHF 100.00].
Publication number: 3807151, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Taverne de la Tour du Bouveret Sàrl, à Port-Valais, CHE-199.273.725, rue du Lac 1, 1897 Bouveret, société à responsabilité limitée (Nouvelle inscription).
Date des statuts:
15.09.2017.
But:
exploiter tout établissement public (notamment café, restaurant, bar), exercer toute activité commerciale ou de service dans les domaines de la restauration, du service traiteur ou de la distribution et achat de tous biens;
la société peut notamment accorder des prêts ou des garanties à des associés ou des tiers, si cela favorise ses intérêts (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Capital social:
CHF 20'000.00.
Obligations de fournir des prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
pour les détails, voir les statuts.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communications aux associés:
par écrit ou courriel. Selon déclaration du 15.09.2017, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint.
Personne(s) inscrite(s):
Palmisano, Stefanie, de Sainte-Croix, à Port-Valais, associée et gérante, avec signature individuelle, pour 150 parts sociales de CHF 100.00;
Palmisano, Luca, de Sainte-Croix, à Port-Valais, associé, sans droit de signature, pour 50 parts sociales de CHF 100.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.