Reports for Talpas AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Talpas AG
- Talpas AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Bever. Talpas AG belongs to the industry «Operation of other financial institutions» and is currently active.
- Talpas AG has 3 persons entered in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 14.10.2019.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of GR is CHE-103.158.431.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.03.1980
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bever
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.3.004.810-2
UID/VAT
CHE-103.158.431
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Direkter oder indirekter, mehr- oder minderheitlicher Erwerb, dauernde Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Beteiligungen an in- und ausländischen Unternehmungen aller Art; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FOPP Organisation & Treuhand AG | St. Moritz | <2004 | 30.10.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Talpas SA
- Talpas Ltd.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Talpas AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004737041, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Talpas AG, in Bever, CHE-103.158.431, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 14 vom 22.01.2015, S.0, Publ. 1946175).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Vukotic, Aline, von Meilen, in Bever, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Meilen].
Publication number: 1946175, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Talpas AG, in Bever, CHE-103.158.431, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 211 vom 31.10.2011, Publ. 6395954).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Vukotic, Aline, von Meilen, in Meilen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 6395954, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Talpas AG, in Bever, CH-350.3.004.810-2, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 28 vom 09.02.2011, S. 8, Publ. 6025510).
Statutenänderung:
14.10.2011.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(Talpas SA) (Talpas Ltd.).
Zweck neu:
Direkter oder indirekter, mehr- oder minderheitlicher Erwerb, dauernde Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Beteiligungen an in- und ausländischen Unternehmungen aller Art;
vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Aktien neu:
900 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00 und 1'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 10.00 (Stimmrechtsaktien). [bisher: 200 Namenaktien zu CHF 500.00].
Mitteilungen neu:
Sofern der Gesellschaft die Namen und Adressen aller Aktionäre bekannt sind, können die Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre auch durch Brief erfolgen. In diesem Falle kann die Publikation im SHAB unterbleiben. Gemäss Erklärung vom 14.10.2011 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fopp Organisation & Treuhand AG (CH-350.3.002.374-2), in St. Moritz, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.