Reports for swiss green medic GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout swiss green medic GmbH
- swiss green medic GmbH from Aarburg operates in the sector «Agriculture (various)» and is active.
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 13.10.2017.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 26.03.2024.
- The company's UID is CHE-489.420.630.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.10.2017
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Aarburg
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.4.443.315-0
UID/VAT
CHE-489.420.630
Sector
Agriculture (various)
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fabrikation und Vertrieb von pharmazeutischen Rohstoffen sowie Lebensmittelzusatzstoffen landwirtschaftlichen Ursprungs, Handel mit Waren aller Art im In- und Ausland, einschliesslich Import und Export von medizinischen Präparaten sowie Betätigung auf verwandten Arbeitsgebieten, insbesondere Forschung, Zucht, Aufzucht und Anbau von medizinischen Pflanzen; kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: swiss green medic GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005994913, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
swiss green medic GmbH, in Aarburg, CHE-489.420.630, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 230 vom 27.11.2023, Publ. 1005894571).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Anev, Plamen Todorov, bulgarischer Staatsangehöriger, in Aarburg, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kadrev, Biser Asenov, bulgarischer Staatsangehöriger, in Aarburg, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, ohne Stammanteil].
Publication number: HR02-1005894571, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
swiss green medic GmbH, in Aarburg, CHE-489.420.630, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 224 vom 17.11.2022, Publ. 1005606817).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kadrev, Biser Asenov, bulgarischer Staatsangehöriger, in Aarburg, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005606817, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
swiss green medic GmbH, in Aarburg, CHE-489.420.630, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 202 vom 18.10.2017, Publ. 3817485).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stojanovic, Darko, von Ittigen, in Münchenbuchsee, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Nikolic, Elvis, serbischer Staatsangehöriger, in Münchenbuchsee, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Anev, Plamen Todorov, bulgarischer Staatsangehöriger, in Aarburg, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.